EP2500883 - High sensitivity and high false alarm immunity optical smoke detector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.03.2019 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.04.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.12.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 115 Tabor Road Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | [2015/51] |
Former [2012/38] | For all designated states Honeywell International, Inc. 101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barson, Michael HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., Patent Services M/S AB/2B 101 Columbia Road P. O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | [2012/38] | Representative(s) | Houghton, Mark Phillip, et al Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [2018/21] |
Former [2012/38] | Buckley, Guy Julian Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 12159547.4 | 14.03.2012 | [2012/38] | Priority number, date | US201113048919 | 16.03.2011 Original published format: US201113048919 | [2012/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2500883 | Date: | 19.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2500883 | Date: | 06.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2500883 | Date: | 23.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G08B17/107, G08B29/24, // G08B29/04, G01N21/53 | [2013/45] | CPC: |
G08B17/107 (EP,US);
G08B17/113 (EP,US);
G08B29/24 (EP,US);
G08B29/043 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/38] | G08B17/107 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/38] | Title | German: | Optischer Rauchdetektor mit hoher Sensibilität und Immunität gegen falschen Alarm | [2012/38] | English: | High sensitivity and high false alarm immunity optical smoke detector | [2012/38] | French: | Détecteur de fumée optique à haute sensibilité et à haute immunité contre les fausses alarmes | [2012/38] | Examination procedure | 14.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/38] | 09.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 06.04.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.04.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.02.2017 | Opposition(s) | 26.02.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.03.2012 | AL | 23.05.2018 | AT | 23.05.2018 | CY | 23.05.2018 | CZ | 23.05.2018 | DK | 23.05.2018 | EE | 23.05.2018 | ES | 23.05.2018 | FI | 23.05.2018 | HR | 23.05.2018 | IT | 23.05.2018 | LT | 23.05.2018 | LV | 23.05.2018 | MC | 23.05.2018 | MK | 23.05.2018 | NL | 23.05.2018 | PL | 23.05.2018 | RO | 23.05.2018 | RS | 23.05.2018 | SE | 23.05.2018 | SI | 23.05.2018 | SK | 23.05.2018 | SM | 23.05.2018 | TR | 23.05.2018 | BG | 23.08.2018 | NO | 23.08.2018 | GR | 24.08.2018 | IS | 23.09.2018 | PT | 24.09.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 14.03.2012 | |
AL | 23.05.2018 | ||
AT | 23.05.2018 | ||
CY | 23.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
TR | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
IS | 23.09.2018 | ||
PT | 24.09.2018 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 23.05.2018 | |
AT | 23.05.2018 | ||
CY | 23.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
TR | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
IS | 23.09.2018 | ||
PT | 24.09.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 23.05.2018 | |
AT | 23.05.2018 | ||
CY | 23.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
TR | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
PT | 24.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 23.05.2018 | |
AT | 23.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
TR | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
PT | 24.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 23.05.2018 | |
AT | 23.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
TR | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 23.05.2018 | |
AT | 23.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 23.05.2018 | |
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 23.05.2018 | |
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 23.05.2018 | |
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
IT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 23.05.2018 | |
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 23.05.2018 | |
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | DK | 23.05.2018 | |
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | ES | 23.05.2018 | |
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | ES | 23.05.2018 | |
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | ES | 23.05.2018 | |
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | ES | 23.05.2018 | |
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 23.05.2018 | |
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [ID]WO2009015178 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US], et al) [ID] 1-8,13,14 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0035] * * claims 2,7 * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0018] *; | [XP]EP2320398 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]) [XP] 1-3,9,13,14 * paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0049] *; | [AP]US2011314902 (DANTLER MARKUS [AT]) [AP] 1-15* the whole document * | by applicant | US2009025453 |