EP2639689 - A multi-source multiple documents comparison display (presentation or discussion) system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.08.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.10.2014 [2014/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Habook Information Technology Inc. 2 F., No. 153, Sec. 3 Xinyi Rd. Da'an Dist. Taipei City 106 / TW | [2013/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wu, Chuan-Wei 2 F., No. 153, Sec. 3, Xinyi Rd., Da`an Dist. 106 Taipei City / TW | 02 /
Liang, Jen-Kai 2 F., No. 153, Sec. 3, Xinyi Rd., Da`an Dist. 106 Taipei City / TW | [2013/38] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Hamborner Straße 53 40472 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/38] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Kennedydamm 55 / Roßstrasse 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 12159598.7 | 15.03.2012 | [2013/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2639689 | Date: | 18.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/14, G09G5/14, G09B9/32, H04N5/262, H04N5/445 | [2013/38] | CPC: |
G09G5/14 (EP);
G06F3/1423 (EP);
G06F3/1438 (EP);
H04N1/00442 (EP);
G09G2370/027 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Mehrquellen-Mehrfachdokument-Vergleichsanzeigesystem (Präsentation und Besprechung) | [2013/38] | English: | A multi-source multiple documents comparison display (presentation or discussion) system | [2013/38] | French: | Système d'affichage de comparaison de documents multiples de plusieurs sources (présentation ou discussion) | [2013/38] | Examination procedure | 19.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/40] | 06.05.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/40] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2009143294 (CITRIX SYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [X]WO0163396 (TOPHEAD COM [KR], et al) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [X]US2007121012 (HIDA YOICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-10 * the whole document * |