EP2471810 - Oxyntomodulin derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.04.2013 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.05.2013 [2013/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | For all designated states Istituto Di Ricerche Di Biologia Molecolare P. Angeletti S.P.A. Via Pontina KM. 30, 600 00040 Pomezia / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2012/33] | For all designated states Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway NJ 07065-0907 / US | ||
For all designated states Istituto Di Ricerche Di Biologia Molecolare P. Angeletti S.P.A. Via Pontina KM. 30, 600 00040 Pomezia / IT | |||
Former [2012/27] | For all designated states Schering Corporation 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | ||
For all designated states Istituto Di Ricerche Di Biologia Molecolare P. Angeletti S.P.A. Via Pontina KM. 30, 600 00040 Pomezia / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Roy, Ranabir Sinha Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | 02 /
Bianchi, Elisabetta IRBM Via Pontina Km 30.600 Pomezia i-00040 Rome / IT | 03 /
Pessi, Antonello IRBM Via Pontina Km 30.600 Pomezia i-00040 Rome / IT | 04 /
Ingallinella, Paolo IRBM Via Pontina Km 30.600 Pomezia i-00040 Rome / IT | 05 /
Marsh, Donald, J. Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | 06 /
Eiermann, George, J. Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | 07 /
Mu, YingJun Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | 08 /
Zhou, Yin-Ping Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | [2012/27] | Representative(s) | Horgan, James Michael Frederic, et al Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 120 Moorgate London, EC2M 6UR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/27] | Horgan, James Michael Frederic, et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Hertford Road Hoddesdon EN11 9BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 12159697.7 | 16.02.2007 | [2012/27] | Priority number, date | US20060775544P | 22.02.2006 Original published format: US 775544 P | US20060834452P | 31.07.2006 Original published format: US 834452 P | [2012/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2471810 | Date: | 04.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/575, A61K38/00 | [2012/27] | CPC: |
A61P3/00 (EP);
C07K14/575 (US);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/08 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
C07K14/605 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Oxyntomodulinderivate | [2012/27] | English: | Oxyntomodulin derivatives | [2012/27] | French: | Dérivés d'oxyntomoduline | [2012/27] | Examination procedure | 04.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/08] | 12.02.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 04.04.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/19] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07751091.5 / EP1991574 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070751091) is 15.03.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO2007056362 (UNIV INDIANA RES & TECH CORP [US], et al) [E] 1-12 * sequences 25, 33, 39 *; | [XP]WO2006134340 (IMP INNOVATIONS LTD [GB], et al) [XP] 1-12 * the whole document * * pages 115-128 * * claim 36 *; | [X]WO2004062685 (IMP COLLEGE INNOVATIONS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-12 * the whole document * * sequence 1 *; | [A]WO0183527 (AMGEN INC [US]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document * * table 1 * | [A] - HINKE SIMON AMADEUS ET AL, "Dipeptidyl peptidase IV (DPIV/CD26) degradation of glucagon: Characterization of glucagon degradation products and DPIV-resistant analogs", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (20000211), vol. 275, no. 6, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 3827 - 3834, XP002445664 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * * figure 7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.275.6.3827 | by applicant | US5932462 | WO03077847 | WO2005000809 | - DAKIN ET AL., ENDOCRINOLOGY, (2001), vol. 142, pages 4244 - 4250 | - DAKIN ET AL., ENDOCRINOLOGY, (2004), vol. 145, pages 2687 - 2695 | - DAKIN ET AL., AM. JPHYSIOL. ENDOCRINOL. METAB., (2002), vol. 283, pages E1173 - E1177 | - CARLES-BONNET ET AL., PEPTIDES, (1996), vol. 17, pages 557 - 561 | - COHEN ET AL., J CLIN. ENDOCRINOL. METAB., (2003), vol. 88, pages 4696 - 4701 | - WYNNE ET AL., DIABETES, (2005), vol. 54, pages 2390 - 2395 | - LOTTE, B. K., J MED. CHEM., (2004), vol. 47, pages 4128 - 4134 | - PENNINGTON; DUNN, PEPTIDE SYNTHESIS PROTOCOLS, (1994), vol. 35 | - JARROUSSE ET AL., ENDOCRINOLOGY, (1984), vol. 115, pages 102 - 105 | - RINK, H., TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1987), vol. 28, pages 3787 - 3789 | - BERNATOWICZ, M. S. ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1989), vol. 30, pages 4645 - 4667 | - SOLE, N. A.; G. BARANY, J ORG. CHEM., (1992), vol. 57, pages 5399 - 5403 | - CASCIERI ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1999), vol. 274, pages 8694 - 8697 | - MINAMI K ET AL., "2000", AM J PHYSIOL ENDOCRINOL METAB., vol. 279, pages E773 - E781 | - LACY ET AL., DIABETES, (1967), vol. 16, pages 35 - 39 | - ZHOU ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2003), vol. 278, pages 51316 - 51323 | - SCROCCHI LA ET AL., NAT MED, (1996), vol. 2, pages 1254 - 1258 | - GELLING, XQ ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U. S. A., (2003), vol. 100, pages 1438 - 1443 | - THORENS, B ET AL., DIABETES, (1993), vol. 42, pages 1678 - 1682 | US20030530867 |