EP2465609 - Method for mixing the contents of a detection chamber [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/25] | Instruments and method for mixing the contents of a detection chamber | ||
[2016/29] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.11.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gen-Probe Incorporated 10210 Genetic Center Drive San Diego, CA 92121-4362 / US | For all designated states Qualigen, Inc. 2042 Corte del Nogal Suite A/B Carlsbad, CA 92011 / US | [2016/52] |
Former [2012/25] | For all designated states Gen-Probe Incorporated 10210 Genetic Center Drive San Diego, CA 92121-4362 / US | ||
For all designated states Qualigen, Inc. 2042 Corte del Nogal Suite A/B Carlsbad, CA 92011 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Breidenthal, Scott 1343 Knoll Drive Oceanside, CA California 92054 / US | 02 /
Fan, Sara 13273 Tiverton Road San Diego, CA California 92130 / US | 03 /
Lee, Richard 4036 Ampudia Street San Diego, CA California 92110 / US | 04 /
Nelson, Norman 3639 Marlesta Drive San Diego, CA California 92111 / US | 05 /
Scott, Matthew 1347 Knoll Drive Oceanside, CA California 92054 / US | 06 /
Taylor, Jason 15 Faith Road Windham, NH New Hampshire 03087 / US | [2012/25] | Representative(s) | Lloyd, John Scott, et al Script IP Limited Turnpike House 18 Bridge Street Frome Somerset BA11 1BB / GB | [2016/52] |
Former [2014/26] | Lloyd, John Scott, et al Script IP Limited Turnpike House 18 Bridge Street Frome, Somerset BA11 1BB / GB | ||
Former [2012/25] | Lloyd, John Scott Edwards Wildman Innovations LLP 20 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2ET / GB | Application number, filing date | 12159759.5 | 20.06.2008 | [2012/25] | Priority number, date | US20070945520P | 21.06.2007 Original published format: US 945520 P | [2012/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2465609 | Date: | 20.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2465609 | Date: | 28.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/00, G01N35/00, B01F11/00 | [2012/25] | CPC: |
B01L3/502715 (EP,US);
B01F31/00 (US);
B01F23/59 (US);
B01F31/31 (EP,US);
B01F31/65 (EP,US);
B01F33/30 (EP,US);
B01F35/2131 (US);
B01L3/502 (US);
B01L3/502761 (EP,US);
B01L7/52 (EP,US);
B01L7/525 (EP,US);
C12N15/1006 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6806 (US);
C12Q1/6844 (US);
G01N1/44 (US);
G01N21/01 (US);
G01N21/6428 (US);
G01N21/645 (EP,US);
G01N35/0098 (EP,US);
B01F2101/23 (US);
B01F2101/33 (US);
B01L2200/0621 (EP,US);
B01L2200/0647 (EP,US);
B01L2200/0673 (EP,US);
B01L2200/0689 (US);
B01L2200/10 (EP,US);
B01L2200/14 (US);
B01L2200/16 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0816 (EP,US);
B01L2300/087 (US);
B01L2300/0887 (EP,US);
B01L2300/123 (EP,US);
B01L2300/1805 (EP,US);
B01L2300/1822 (EP,US);
B01L2300/1883 (EP,US);
B01L2400/0457 (US);
B01L2400/0478 (US);
B01L2400/0481 (EP,US);
B01L2400/0655 (EP,US);
B01L2400/0677 (EP,US);
B01L3/50273 (EP,US);
B01L3/505 (EP);
G01N2021/6419 (EP,US);
G01N2021/6421 (EP,US);
G01N2021/6432 (US);
G01N2021/6439 (US);
G01N2021/6463 (US);
G01N2035/00544 (EP,US);
G01N2201/0627 (EP,US);
Y10T137/0391 (EP,US);
Y10T436/143333 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/52] |
Former [2012/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Mischen der Inhalte einer Nachweiskammer | [2016/29] | English: | Method for mixing the contents of a detection chamber | [2016/29] | French: | Procédé pour mélanger le contenu d'une chambre de détection | [2016/29] |
Former [2012/25] | Instrumente und Verfahren zum Mischen der Inhalte einer Nachweiskammer | ||
Former [2012/25] | Instruments and method for mixing the contents of a detection chamber | ||
Former [2012/25] | Instruments et procédé pour mélanger le contenu d'une chambre de détection | Examination procedure | 19.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/07] | 09.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.06.2016 | 17.06.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 13.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 16.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.11.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08768656.4 / EP2175999 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080768656) is 09.09.2013 | Opposition(s) | 29.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.06.2008 | AT | 28.12.2016 | BE | 28.12.2016 | CY | 28.12.2016 | CZ | 28.12.2016 | DK | 28.12.2016 | EE | 28.12.2016 | ES | 28.12.2016 | FI | 28.12.2016 | HR | 28.12.2016 | IT | 28.12.2016 | LT | 28.12.2016 | LV | 28.12.2016 | MC | 28.12.2016 | NL | 28.12.2016 | PL | 28.12.2016 | RO | 28.12.2016 | SE | 28.12.2016 | SI | 28.12.2016 | SK | 28.12.2016 | TR | 28.12.2016 | BG | 28.03.2017 | NO | 28.03.2017 | GR | 29.03.2017 | IS | 28.04.2017 | PT | 28.04.2017 | IE | 20.06.2017 | LU | 20.06.2017 | MT | 20.06.2017 | CH | 30.06.2017 | LI | 30.06.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 20.06.2008 | |
AT | 28.12.2016 | ||
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CY | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
IE | 20.06.2017 | ||
LU | 20.06.2017 | ||
MT | 20.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 20.06.2008 | |
AT | 28.12.2016 | ||
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
IE | 20.06.2017 | ||
LU | 20.06.2017 | ||
MT | 20.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
IE | 20.06.2017 | ||
LU | 20.06.2017 | ||
MT | 20.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
IE | 20.06.2017 | ||
LU | 20.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
LU | 20.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/01] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | CZ | 28.12.2016 | |
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/31] | FI | 28.12.2016 | |
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/28] | FI | 28.12.2016 | |
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 28.12.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3898457 (PACKARD LYLE E, et al) [X] 1,10 * the whole document *; | [X]US5374395 (ROBINSON DAVID [GB], et al) [X] 1-5,8-15 * column 13, line 42 - column 17, line 2 *; | [A]WO0013014 (QUALISYS DIAGNOSTICS INC [US]) [A] 1-15* page 5, line 8 - page 11, line 16; figures 3-6 *; | [X]US2004223878 (CHEN SHUQI [US]) [X] 1-5,8-12,14,15 * paragraph [0065]; figure 15 *; | [X]US2006030038 (TAYLOR MICHAEL T [US], et al) [X] 1,10 * paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0083] * * paragraph [0088] - paragraph [0125] *; | [X]WO2006121997 (IDAHO TECHNOLOGY INC [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5,8-10,12,14,15 * page 5, line 11 - page 14, line 24 * * page 18, line 1 - page 30, line 10; figures 1,5,8 *; | [A]US2006275852 (MONTAGU JEAN I [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0182] - paragraph [0232]; figures 5,6,5a *; | [AP]WO2008055915 (CLONDIAG GMBH [DE], et al) [AP] 1,3,5,8-10,12,14,15 * page 15, line 6 - page 17, line 16 * * page 70, line 14 - page 83, line 5 * * page 90, line 6 - page 99, line 10; figures 1b,1c,3,17a-21 * | by applicant | US3476515 | US3496061 | US3862302 | US4581333 | US4655047 | US4683195 | US4982577 | US5124246 | US5130238 | US5131760 | US5283174 | US5288611 | US5374395 | US5399491 | US5424413 | US5427930 | US5447841 | US5455166 | US5460780 | US5476774 | US5547842 | US5591578 | US5641658 | US5656207 | US5658737 | US5705628 | US5710029 | US5731148 | US5766849 | US5786208 | US5824518 | US5834254 | US5840488 | US5849478 | US5925517 | US5928862 | US6013170 | US6150097 | US6232079 | US6251684 | US6297365 | US6312906 | US6342123 | US6361945 | US6410278 | US6534273 | US6691041 | US6849412 | US6911327 | US2005287591 | US2006068398 | US2006276972 | US2006292619 | US7282328 | US7374885 | - FRIEDENBERG ET AL., "Developing a Fully Automated Instrument for Molecular Diagnostic Assays", IVD TECHNOLOGY, (2005), vol. II, no. 6, pages 47 - 53 | - HILL, "Automating Nucleic Acid Amplification Tests", IVD TECHNOLOGY, (2000), vol. 6, no. 7, pages 36 - 45, XP003032613 | - BURKE, WAAC NEWSLETTER, (1992), vol. 14, no. 2, pages 13 - 17 | - KWIATKOWSKI ET AL., "Clinical, Genetic, and Pharmacogenetic Applications of the Invader Assay", MOL. DIAGN., (1999), vol. 4, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1016/S1084-8592(99)80012-5, pages 353 - 64, XP008021845 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1084-8592(99)80012-5 | - LIZARDI ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1988), vol. 6, page 1197 | - "Labels and Detection Formats in Amplification Assays", JUNG, P. ET AL., Nucleic Acid Amplification Technologies, BIOTECHNIQUE BOOKS, (1997), pages 135 - 150 | - TYAGI ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1996), vol. 14, no. 3, pages 303 - 308 | - TAPP ET AL., BIOTECHNIQUES, (2000), vol. 28, no. 4, pages 732 - 738 | - NAZARENKO, METHODS MOL. BIOL., (2006), vol. 335, pages 95 - 114 | - NAZARENKO, NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1997), vol. 25, no. 12, pages 2516 - 2521 | - TYAGI ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1998), vol. 16, pages 49 - 53 | - PACKARD ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1996), vol. 93, pages 11640 - 11645 | - CARRUTHERS ET AL., J 54 METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, (1987), page 287 | US20070832367 |