EP2640082 - A processing module for injecting a digital media transport stream into a host device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SmarDTV S.A. Route de Genève 22 1033 Cheseaux-sur-Lausanne / CH | [2013/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Deprez, Olivier Impasse Basse Bertrandière, 1 Bis 13600 La Ciotat / FR | [2013/38] | Representative(s) | Leman Consulting S.A. Chemin de Précossy 31 1260 Nyon / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2013/38] | Leman Consulting S.A. Chemin de Précossy 31 1260 Nyon / CH | Application number, filing date | 12159791.8 | 16.03.2012 | [2013/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2640082 | Date: | 18.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2640082 | Date: | 18.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/418, H04N21/61, H04N21/643, H04N21/438, H04N21/43, H04L29/06 | [2013/38] | CPC: |
H04N21/4183 (EP);
H04L65/612 (EP);
H04L65/764 (EP);
H04N21/4305 (EP);
H04N21/4381 (EP);
H04N21/6125 (EP);
H04N21/64322 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/47] |
Former [2013/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verarbeitungsmodul zur Injektion eines digitalen Medienübertragungsstroms auf eine Host-Vorrichtung | [2013/38] | English: | A processing module for injecting a digital media transport stream into a host device | [2013/38] | French: | Module de traitement pour injecter un flux de transport multimédia numérique dans un dispositif hôte | [2013/38] | Examination procedure | 18.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/17] | 03.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.05.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.02.2015 | Opposition(s) | 19.08.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 18.11.2015 | AT | 18.11.2015 | BG | 18.11.2015 | CY | 18.11.2015 | CZ | 18.11.2015 | EE | 18.11.2015 | HR | 18.11.2015 | LT | 18.11.2015 | LV | 18.11.2015 | MC | 18.11.2015 | MK | 18.11.2015 | RS | 18.11.2015 | SI | 18.11.2015 | SK | 18.11.2015 | SM | 18.11.2015 | LU | 16.03.2016 | IS | 18.03.2016 | MT | 31.03.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
BG | 18.11.2015 | ||
CY | 18.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
MK | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
LU | 16.03.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
MT | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
CY | 18.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
MK | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
LU | 16.03.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
MT | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
CY | 18.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
MK | 18.11.2015 | ||
MT | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
LU | 16.03.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
MT | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
LU | 16.03.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
LU | 16.03.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/47] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
LU | 16.03.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | HR | 18.11.2015 | |
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | LT | 18.11.2015 | |
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 18.11.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2020800 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0013] , [0017] , [0032] - [0051] - [0072] - [0074] - [0105] - [0106]; figures 2,4 *; | [Y]EP2026558 (SONY UK LTD [GB]) [Y] 1,2,4-10 * paragraphs [0021] - [0022] - [0029] - [0031] - [0036] , [0043] - [0044]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO2012029018 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-11 * figure 1 * * page 2, line 12 - line 30 * * page 4, line 8 - page 5, line 5 ** page 6, line 23 - line 31 *; | [Y] - IRAJ SODAGAR, "The MPEG-DASH Standard for Multimedia Streaming Over the Internet", IEEE MULTIMEDIA, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20110401), vol. 18, no. 4, doi:10.1109/MMUL.2011.71, ISSN 1070-986X, pages 62 - 67, XP011378371 [Y] 1,2,4-10 * page 4; figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MMUL.2011.71 | [A] - "MPEG transport stream", (20100718), pages 1 - 8, URL: http://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=MPEG_transport_stream&oldid=374152729, (20111024), XP055010297 [A] 1,7-9 * page 4 * | [A] - PANTOS R, "HTTP Live Streaming", INTERNET CITATION, (20090608), pages 1 - 17, URL: http://tools.ietf.org/html/draft-pantos-http-live-streaming-01, (20090608), XP002555827 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * | [A] - ALEXANDER M ET AL, "CIplus-Standard und neue Anwendungsmöglichkeiten", FKT FERNSEH UND KINOTECHNIK, FACHVERLAG SCHIELE & SCHON GMBH., BERLIN, DE, (20100801), vol. 64, no. 8-9, ISSN 1430-9947, pages 424 - 429, XP001558110 [A] 1-11 * page 4, column 2, line 10 - page 5, column 1, line 11 * | by applicant | US2001019976 |