EP2503024 - Apparatus and method for Producing Laminated Body. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/39] | Apparatus for Producing Laminated Body | ||
[2015/29] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.11.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kojima Press Industry Co., Ltd. 30, Shimoichiba-cho 3-chome Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-0875 / JP | [2012/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hayakawa, Munetaka Kojima Press Industry Co., Ltd. 30, Shimoichiba-cho 3-chome Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-0875 / JP | 02 /
Ito, Kaoru Kojima Press Industry Co., Ltd. 30, Shimoichiba-cho 3-chome Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-0875 / JP | 03 /
Takahashi, Yasuhiko Kojima Press Industry Co., Ltd. 30, Shimoichiba-cho 3-chome Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-0875 / JP | [2012/39] | Representative(s) | Naylor, Matthew John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [2016/02] |
Former [2012/39] | Naylor, Matthew John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 12160451.6 | 20.03.2012 | [2012/39] | Priority number, date | JP20110063462 | 23.03.2011 Original published format: JP 2011063462 | [2012/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2503024 | Date: | 26.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2503024 | Date: | 13.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/54, C23C16/04, B05D7/00, B05D1/00, B05D7/04 | [2015/29] | CPC: |
B05D1/60 (EP,US);
B05D7/04 (EP,US);
B05D7/50 (EP,US);
C23C16/042 (EP,US);
C23C16/545 (EP,US);
B05D2252/02 (EP,US);
C23C14/562 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/39] | C23C16/54, C23C16/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/02] |
Former [2012/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines laminierten Körpers | [2015/29] | English: | Apparatus and method for Producing Laminated Body. | [2015/29] | French: | Appareil et procédé production de corps stratifié | [2015/29] |
Former [2012/39] | Vorrichtung zur Herstellung eines laminierten Körpers | ||
Former [2012/39] | Apparatus for Producing Laminated Body | ||
Former [2012/39] | Appareil de production de corps stratifié | Examination procedure | 13.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/17] | 27.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 13.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.09.2013 | Opposition(s) | 14.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.03.2012 | AL | 13.01.2016 | AT | 13.01.2016 | BE | 13.01.2016 | CY | 13.01.2016 | CZ | 13.01.2016 | DK | 13.01.2016 | EE | 13.01.2016 | ES | 13.01.2016 | FI | 13.01.2016 | HR | 13.01.2016 | IT | 13.01.2016 | LT | 13.01.2016 | LV | 13.01.2016 | MC | 13.01.2016 | MK | 13.01.2016 | NL | 13.01.2016 | PL | 13.01.2016 | RO | 13.01.2016 | RS | 13.01.2016 | SE | 13.01.2016 | SI | 13.01.2016 | SK | 13.01.2016 | SM | 13.01.2016 | TR | 13.01.2016 | IE | 20.03.2016 | LU | 20.03.2016 | CH | 31.03.2016 | LI | 31.03.2016 | MT | 31.03.2016 | BG | 13.04.2016 | GB | 13.04.2016 | NO | 13.04.2016 | GR | 14.04.2016 | IS | 13.05.2016 | PT | 13.05.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 20.03.2012 | |
AT | 13.01.2016 | ||
BE | 13.01.2016 | ||
CY | 13.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2016 | ||
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
MC | 13.01.2016 | ||
MK | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
RS | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SI | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
SM | 13.01.2016 | ||
TR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IE | 20.03.2016 | ||
LU | 20.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
MT | 31.03.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
GB | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 20.03.2012 | |
AT | 13.01.2016 | ||
BE | 13.01.2016 | ||
CY | 13.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2016 | ||
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
MC | 13.01.2016 | ||
MK | 13.01.2016 | ||
MT | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
RS | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SI | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
SM | 13.01.2016 | ||
IE | 20.03.2016 | ||
LU | 20.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
GB | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
BE | 13.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2016 | ||
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
MC | 13.01.2016 | ||
MT | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
RS | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SI | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
SM | 13.01.2016 | ||
IE | 20.03.2016 | ||
LU | 20.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
GB | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/15] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
BE | 13.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2016 | ||
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
MC | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
RS | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SI | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
SM | 13.01.2016 | ||
IE | 20.03.2016 | ||
LU | 20.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
GB | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/08] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
BE | 13.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2016 | ||
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
MC | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
RS | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
SM | 13.01.2016 | ||
IE | 20.03.2016 | ||
LU | 20.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
GB | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
BE | 13.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2016 | ||
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
MC | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
RS | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
SM | 13.01.2016 | ||
IE | 20.03.2016 | ||
LU | 20.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
BE | 13.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2016 | ||
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
MC | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
RS | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
SM | 13.01.2016 | ||
LU | 20.03.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
CZ | 13.01.2016 | ||
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
MC | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
RS | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
SM | 13.01.2016 | ||
LU | 20.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
MC | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RS | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
LU | 20.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/47] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RS | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
LU | 20.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RS | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RS | 13.01.2016 | ||
SE | 13.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 13.01.2016 | |
ES | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
IT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 13.01.2016 | |
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
NL | 13.01.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/30] | NL | 13.01.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2006093168 (YOUTEC CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,7,11-15 * abstract * [I] 3-6,8-10 | Examination | JP2007308774 | WO0240598 | by applicant | JP2001261867 | JP2008287996 |