EP2503272 - Device for drying loose material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.11.2017 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.12.2017 [2017/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Finnomec Oy Matalalahdentie 28 74170 Iisalmi / FI | [2012/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jolkin, Veikko Peltoniementie 4 FI-73100 Lapinlahti / FI | 02 /
Rönkkö, Veijo Matalalahdentie 28 FI-74170 Iisalmi / FI | [2012/39] | Representative(s) | Kolster Oy Ab (Salmisaarenaukio 1) P.O. Box 204 00181 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2012/39] | Pitkänen, Hannu Alpo Antero Patent Agency Pitkänen Oy P.O. Box 1188 70211 Kuopio / FI | Application number, filing date | 12160518.2 | 21.03.2012 | [2012/39] | Priority number, date | FI20110000100 | 21.03.2011 Original published format: FI 20110100 | [2012/39] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2503272 | Date: | 26.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2503272 | Date: | 29.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F26B17/00, F26B23/10 | [2012/39] | CPC: |
F26B17/003 (EP);
F26B23/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Trocknen von Schüttgut | [2012/39] | English: | Device for drying loose material | [2012/39] | French: | Dispositif de séchage de matériaux en vrac | [2012/39] | Examination procedure | 29.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/02] | 04.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/50] | 24.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/50] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.03.2014 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 25.01.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 25.01.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.02.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2017 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1611527 (GUSTAV HILGENBERG) [A] 1-6 * figures 1-2 ** page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 65 *; | [XYI]FR2293524 (MUNTZER EMILE [FR]) [X] 1 * figure sheets I-11 - II-11 * * page 1, lines 1-19 * * page 4, line 18- - page 9, line 31 * [Y] 2-4 [I] 5,6; | [Y]WO9422764 (VALENCE TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [Y] 2-4 * figure 3 * * page 11, line 3 - page 13, line 7 * * page 14, lines 4-5 * |