EP2641509 - Heating pad [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.09.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.10.2014 [2014/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Uyttebrock, Jean-Christophe Quai de Rome, 15A 4000 Liège / BE | For all designated states Lacroix, Marc Rue du Bassinia, 29 1348 Louvain-la-Neuve / BE | For all designated states Baise, Etienne Rue Binet, 1 4140 Sprimont / BE | [2013/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2013/39] | Representative(s) | Pecher, Nicolas, et al Abyoo sprl Centre Monnet Avenue Jean Monnet, 1 1348 Louvain-la-Neuve / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/39] | Pecher, Nicolas, et al Pecher & de Groote sprl Centre Monnet Avenue Jean Monnet, 1 1348 Louvain-la-Neuve / BE | Application number, filing date | 12161031.5 | 23.03.2012 | [2013/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2641509 | Date: | 25.09.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A47C7/74, A47C7/02, A47C4/54 | [2013/39] | CPC: |
A47C7/748 (EP);
A47C7/021 (EP,US);
A47C4/54 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Heizkissen | [2013/39] | English: | Heating pad | [2013/39] | French: | Coussin chauffant | [2013/39] | Examination procedure | 26.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/41] | 06.05.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/41] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US5771514 (WILHOIT CHRISTOPHER S [US]) [X] 1-3,6,9 * column 4, line 28 - column 8, line 19; figures 1-5 * [Y] 7 [I] 4,5,8,12; | [XYI]US5979975 (HIRAOKA MARC N [US]) [X] 1,6,13 * column 1, line 48 - column 2, line 33; figures 1-6 * * column 2, line 59 - column 3, line 13 * [Y] 7 [I] 5,8,12; | [I]DE202004019078U (MUEHLBERGER GMBH [DE]) [I] 1,6,10,11,14,15 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0009]; figures 1-4 *; | [XYI]KR100996158B (PARK KOOK CHEOL [KR]) [X] 1-3,6,14,15 * paragraph [0024] - paragraphs [0029] , [0034]; figures 4,5; claim 1 * [Y] 7 [I] 4,5,8,12; | [Y]CN201888551U (SHUYA CAO) [Y] 7* abstract *; | [XYI]CN202009897U (YANTING LIU) [X] 1-3,14 * abstract * [Y] 7 [I] 4,5,8,12 | by applicant | WO2005023057 |