EP2505093 - Hair extension, method for extending hair and hair extension set [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.08.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.10.2013 [2013/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ofer, Gerhard Auf dem Beuel 17 53773 Hennef / DE | [2012/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Guerrero Onofre, César Av. Mare de déu de Montserrat 125 bajos 08024 Barcelona / ES | [2012/40] | Representative(s) | Bungartz, Klaus Peter Patentanwälte Bungartz & Tersteegen Im Mediapark 6A 50670 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/40] | Bungartz, Klaus Peter Patentanwälte Bungartz & Tersteegen Eupener Strasse 161a 50933 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 12161142.0 | 23.03.2012 | [2012/40] | Priority number, date | ES20110030475 | 29.03.2011 Original published format: ES 201130475 | [2012/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2505093 | Date: | 03.10.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A41G5/00 | [2012/40] | CPC: |
A41G5/008 (EP,ES)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Haarverlängerung und Verfahren zum Verlängern von Haaren und Haarverlängerungsset | [2012/40] | English: | Hair extension, method for extending hair and hair extension set | [2012/40] | French: | Allongement des cheveux et procédé d'allongement des cheveux et kit d'allongement des cheveux | [2012/40] | Examination procedure | 04.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/40] | 15.05.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/40] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2011005544 (LANE TERESA [US]) [X] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [X]DE1962692 (RIEGER ARNULF) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [X]DE102006047949 (MEHRINGER THILO [DE]) [X] 1,2,4 * the whole document *; | [XY]EP2165614 (HENKEL AG & CO KGAA [DE]) [X] 1,2,4 * the whole document * [Y] 5-7; | [YA]US5868145 (SPANN CAROLYN H [US]) [Y] 5-7 * the whole document * [A] 1 | by applicant | ES2237331 | ES1048116U | ES1056533U | ES1064500U | ES1065775U | ES232642U | EP0175960 | EP19980830205 | WO2003IB00165 | WO1996ES00189 |