EP2511702 - Electromechanical transducer and photoacoustic apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.04.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.05.2022 [2022/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2012/42] | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Torashima, Kazutoshi c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo, 146-8501 / JP | 02 /
Kasanuki, Yuji c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo, 146-8501 / JP | [2012/42] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2012/42] | Application number, filing date | 12161161.0 | 26.03.2012 | [2012/42] | Priority number, date | JP20110090123 | 14.04.2011 Original published format: JP 2011090123 | [2012/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2511702 | Date: | 17.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2511702 | Date: | 23.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01N29/24, G01H9/00, B06B1/02 | [2016/12] | CPC: |
G01N29/2418 (EP,US);
B06B1/0292 (EP,US);
G01H9/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/42] | G01N29/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/44] |
Former [2012/42] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Elektromechanischer Wandler und photoakustische Vorrichtung | [2012/42] | English: | Electromechanical transducer and photoacoustic apparatus | [2012/42] | French: | Transducteur électromécanique et appareil photoacoustique | [2012/42] | Examination procedure | 23.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.09.2016 | Examination requested [2016/44] | 12.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/18] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.03.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007125181 (OFEK ERAN [IL], et al); | [A]US2010123366 (CHANG CHIENLIU [JP]); | [YA]US2010207485 (DIRKSEN PETER [NL], et al); | [XY]US2010327380 (CHANG CHIENLIU [JP]) | by applicant | JP2010075681 |