EP2644374 - Insulation board [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 21.03.2014 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2014 | Refusal of application | published on 23.04.2014 [2014/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huntsman International LLC 500 Huntsman Way Salt Lake City, UT 84108 / US | [2013/40] | Representative(s) | Swinnen, Anne-Marie, et al Huntsman (Europe) BVBA Intellectual Property Department Everslaan 45 3078 Everberg / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/40] | Swinnen, Anne-Marie, et al Huntsman (Europe) BVBA Intellectual Property Department Everslaan 45 3078 Everberg / BE | Application number, filing date | 12161194.1 | 26.03.2012 | [2013/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2644374 | Date: | 02.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B32B15/08, B32B27/40, E04B1/76 | [2013/40] | CPC: |
B32B15/08 (EP,RU,US);
B32B15/046 (EP,RU,US);
E04B1/76 (RU,US);
B32B15/20 (EP,RU,US);
B32B27/10 (RU,US);
B32B27/40 (EP,RU,US);
B32B37/20 (RU,US);
B32B5/18 (RU,US);
E04B1/80 (EP,RU,US);
B32B2250/40 (US);
B32B2255/06 (US);
B32B2255/12 (US);
B32B2255/26 (US);
B32B2266/0278 (EP,US);
B32B2307/102 (EP,US);
B32B2307/304 (EP,US);
B32B2419/00 (EP,US);
E04B2001/7691 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249991 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31547 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31551 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Isolierplatte | [2013/40] | English: | Insulation board | [2013/40] | French: | Panneau d'isolation | [2013/40] | Examination procedure | 03.12.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2014/17] | 13.12.2013 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2014/17] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2009023170 (ATLAS ROOFING CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-10* paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0029] *; | [A]EP2210991 (ECOTHERM BEHEER B V [NL]) [A] 1-10 * claim 3 *; | [XA]WO2010136126 (BAYER MATERIALSCIENCE AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,4,8 * claims 1,3 * [A] 2,3,5-7,9,10 | by applicant | EP1431473 | WO2004111101 | CN101109220 | EP2210991 | - G. WOODS, The ICI Polyurethanes Book, (1990), pages 32 - 35 | - G.WOODS, The ICI Polyurethanes Book, (1990), pages 32 - 35 |