EP2505420 - Control device for the charging procedure of an electric vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.10.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.08.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.11.2018 [2018/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABL SURSUM BAYERISCHE ELEKTROZUBEHÖR GmbH & Co. KG Albert-Büttner-Straße 11 91207 Lauf / DE | [2018/03] |
Former [2012/40] | For all designated states ABL SURSUM BAYERISCHE ELEKTROZUBEHÖR GmbH & Co. KG Ottensooser Strasse 22 91207 Lauf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heindl, Peter Stockweiherweg 15 90602 Pyrbaum / DE | [2012/40] | Representative(s) | Schlögl, Markus, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Bankgasse 3 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/40] | Schlögl, Markus, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Bankgasse 3 90402 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 12161225.3 | 26.03.2012 | [2012/40] | Priority number, date | DE20112000704U | 28.03.2011 Original published format: DE 202011000704 U | [2012/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2505420 | Date: | 03.10.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2505420 | Date: | 02.08.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B60L11/18, B60L3/00, B60L3/04 | [2017/31] | CPC: |
B60L3/04 (EP,US);
B60L3/0069 (EP);
B60L53/18 (EP,US);
B60L53/305 (EP,US);
B60L53/65 (EP);
B60L2210/30 (EP);
B60L2240/529 (EP);
B60L2240/549 (EP);
B60L2250/16 (EP);
B60L2260/42 (EP);
Y02T10/70 (EP);
Y02T10/7072 (EP);
Y02T10/72 (EP);
Y02T90/12 (EP);
Y02T90/14 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2012/40] | B60L11/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/11] |
Former [2012/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Steuervorrichtung für den Ladevorgang eines Elektrofahrzeugs | [2012/40] | English: | Control device for the charging procedure of an electric vehicle | [2012/40] | French: | Dispositif de commande pour procédé de chargement d'un véhicule électrique | [2012/40] | Examination procedure | 26.03.2012 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/11] | 23.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.10.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/48] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.08.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2010007306 (FUKUI SATOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0078] * * paragraph [0104] - paragraph [0136] * * figures 1-12 *; | [X]WO2010055411 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0095] * * figures 1-6 *; | [X]DE102009025302 (RWE AG [DE]) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0073] * * figures 1-4 *; | [X]DE102010011162 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0038] ** figures 1-3 * |