EP2509302 - Image processing apparatus, image processing method, and computer program [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.05.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.2015 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | 08.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.06.2015 [2015/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2012/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Satou, Daisuke c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan, Minato-ku TOKYO, Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 02 /
Ueda, Atsushi c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan, Minato-ku TOKYO, Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 03 /
Minakuti, Jun c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan, Minato-ku TOKYO, Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2012/41] | Representative(s) | Körber, Martin Hans Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/41] | Körber, Martin Hans Mitscherlich & Partner Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12161957.1 | 29.03.2012 | [2012/41] | Priority number, date | JP20110083996 | 05.04.2011 Original published format: JP 2011083996 | [2012/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2509302 | Date: | 10.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2509302 | Date: | 10.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/357, H04N5/232, H04N5/235 | [2013/28] | CPC: |
G06T7/11 (EP,US);
H04N23/667 (EP,US);
H04N23/69 (EP,US);
H04N23/70 (EP,US);
H04N23/80 (EP,US);
G06T2207/20132 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/41] | H04N5/357 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Bildverarbeitungsvorrichtung, Bildverarbeitungsverfahren und Computerprogramm | [2012/41] | English: | Image processing apparatus, image processing method, and computer program | [2012/41] | French: | Appareil de traitement d'images, procédé de traitement d'images et programme informatique | [2012/41] | Examination procedure | 29.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/41] | 21.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/24] | 04.02.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/24] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.08.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2015 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2008022202 (CRAIG MURRAY D [US], et al); | [Y]US2009297060 (HATTORI MITSUAKI [JP]); | [XYI]US2011001854 (NGUYEN HUGH PHU [US]); | by applicant | JP2009296031 | JP2011083996 |