EP2645357 - Display apparatus and driving method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.04.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.05.2016 [2016/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2013/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Park, Tae-soon 341-901, Sibeom Daeunmaeul World Meridian Bansong-dong Song-ri Dongtan-myeon, Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2013/40] | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/40] | Fearnside, Andrew Simon Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax, HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 12162045.4 | 29.03.2012 | [2013/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2645357 | Date: | 02.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/288, G09G3/20, G09G3/00, H04N13/04 | [2013/40] | CPC: |
G09G3/003 (EP);
G09G3/2022 (EP);
G09G3/204 (EP);
G09G3/288 (EP);
H04N13/341 (EP);
H04N13/398 (EP);
G09G2360/16 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Anzeigevorrichtung und Verfahren zu ihrer Ansteuerung | [2013/40] | English: | Display apparatus and driving method thereof | [2013/40] | French: | Appareil d'affichage et son procédé de commande | [2013/40] | Examination procedure | 27.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/40] | 07.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/20] | 13.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/20] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.08.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005275605 (KWON TAE-KYONG [KR]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1469444 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2011045924 (PANASONIC CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | EP2477174 [ ] (PANASONIC CORP [JP]) | by applicant | KR20110116540 |