EP2508406 - Front structure of a rail vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.10.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.11.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bombardier Transportation GmbH Schöneberger Ufer 1 10785 Berlin / DE | [2012/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Löber, Mirko Mittelstraße 17 34246 Vellmar / DE | 02 /
Sifri, Nino Grüne Straße 15 34323 Malsfeld / DE | 03 /
Brunke, Volker Bei den Weidenbäumen 43 34128 Kassel / DE | [2012/41] | Representative(s) | Brunotte, Joachim Wilhelm Eberhard Patentanwälte Bressel und Partner mbB Potsdamer Platz 10 10785 Berlin / DE | [2016/51] |
Former [2012/41] | Brunotte, Joachim Wilhelm Eberhard Bressel und Partner Patentanwälte Park Kolonnaden Potsdamer Platz 10 10785 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 12162230.2 | 29.03.2012 | [2012/41] | Priority number, date | DE20111007090 | 08.04.2011 Original published format: DE102011007090 | [2012/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2508406 | Date: | 10.10.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2508406 | Date: | 21.12.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B61C17/04 | [2012/41] | CPC: |
B61D17/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/51] |
Former [2012/41] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Frontstruktur eines Schienenfahrzeugs | [2012/41] | English: | Front structure of a rail vehicle | [2012/41] | French: | Structure avant d'un véhicule sur rail | [2012/41] | Examination procedure | 09.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/21] | 19.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.11.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.07.2016 | Opposition(s) | 22.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.03.2012 | AL | 21.12.2016 | CY | 21.12.2016 | DK | 21.12.2016 | EE | 21.12.2016 | FI | 21.12.2016 | HR | 21.12.2016 | IT | 21.12.2016 | LT | 21.12.2016 | LV | 21.12.2016 | MC | 21.12.2016 | MK | 21.12.2016 | MT | 21.12.2016 | NL | 21.12.2016 | RO | 21.12.2016 | RS | 21.12.2016 | SE | 21.12.2016 | SI | 21.12.2016 | SK | 21.12.2016 | SM | 21.12.2016 | TR | 21.12.2016 | BG | 21.03.2017 | NO | 21.03.2017 | GR | 22.03.2017 | AT | 29.03.2017 | GB | 29.03.2017 | IE | 29.03.2017 | LU | 29.03.2017 | BE | 31.03.2017 | CH | 31.03.2017 | LI | 31.03.2017 | IS | 21.04.2017 | PT | 21.04.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 29.03.2012 | |
CY | 21.12.2016 | ||
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
IT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
MK | 21.12.2016 | ||
MT | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
TR | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
AT | 29.03.2017 | ||
GB | 29.03.2017 | ||
IE | 29.03.2017 | ||
LU | 29.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 29.03.2012 | |
CY | 21.12.2016 | ||
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
IT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
MK | 21.12.2016 | ||
MT | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
AT | 29.03.2017 | ||
GB | 29.03.2017 | ||
IE | 29.03.2017 | ||
LU | 29.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 29.03.2012 | |
CY | 21.12.2016 | ||
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
IT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
MT | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
AT | 29.03.2017 | ||
GB | 29.03.2017 | ||
IE | 29.03.2017 | ||
LU | 29.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 29.03.2012 | |
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
IT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
MT | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
AT | 29.03.2017 | ||
GB | 29.03.2017 | ||
IE | 29.03.2017 | ||
LU | 29.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | DK | 21.12.2016 | |
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
IT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
MT | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
AT | 29.03.2017 | ||
GB | 29.03.2017 | ||
IE | 29.03.2017 | ||
LU | 29.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/40] | DK | 21.12.2016 | |
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
IT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
AT | 29.03.2017 | ||
GB | 29.03.2017 | ||
IE | 29.03.2017 | ||
LU | 29.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | DK | 21.12.2016 | |
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
IT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
GB | 29.03.2017 | ||
IE | 29.03.2017 | ||
LU | 29.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | DK | 21.12.2016 | |
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
IT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
GB | 29.03.2017 | ||
IE | 29.03.2017 | ||
LU | 29.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | DK | 21.12.2016 | |
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
IT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LU | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/01] | DK | 21.12.2016 | |
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
IT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | EE | 21.12.2016 | |
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
IT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | EE | 21.12.2016 | |
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/31] | FI | 21.12.2016 | |
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/28] | FI | 21.12.2016 | |
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 21.12.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2007261591 (BRAVO RAUL V [US], et al) [Y] 1-5,7-12 * figure 12 *; | [Y]DE102006044397 (BOMBARDIER TRANSP GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-5,7-12 * figure 1 *; | [Y]EP0872397 (GEC ALSTHOM TRANSPORT SA [FR]) [Y] 1-5,7-12 * column 1, paragraph 1; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]EP0369134 (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM [DE]) [Y] 1,7,8 * figures 4,5 *; | [A]EP0474510 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1,6,7 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0756979 |