EP2644051 - Bag [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.03.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.04.2014 [2014/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lofthagen, Michael Tjurbergsgatan 32 118 58 Stockholm / SE | For all designated states Lundberg, Sofia Tjurbergsgatan 32 118 56 Stockholm / SE | For all designated states Ulvsbäck, Magnus Nordgårdsvägen 3 428 34 Kållered / SE | For all designated states Petersson, Leif Skonaregatan 9 234 42 Lomma / SE | [2013/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2013/40] | Representative(s) | Engdahl, Stefan, et al Awapatent AB P.O. Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/40] | Engdahl, Stefan, et al AWAPATENT AB P.O. Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 12162627.9 | 30.03.2012 | [2013/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2644051 | Date: | 02.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A45C13/00, A45C13/02, D06F95/00 | [2013/40] | CPC: |
A45C13/02 (EP);
A45C13/008 (EP);
A45C3/00 (EP);
D06F95/006 (EP);
A45C2013/026 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Beutel | [2013/40] | English: | Bag | [2013/40] | French: | Sac | [2013/40] | Examination procedure | 24.03.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]FR2771717 (BENOIT PHILIPPE [FR]) [X] 1-8,10-13 * page 1, line 1 - page 3, line 13; figures 1-5 * [Y] 9; | [Y]US5288150 (BEARMAN JODI [US]) [Y] 9 * column 2, line 31 - column 2, line 59; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2011126357 (HARTMAN KEITH [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * figures 3-8 *; | [AD]US2012029458 (NORMAN JOSHUA JAMES [US], et al) [AD] 1-13 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0010]; figures 1-8 * | by applicant | US2012029458 |