EP2495768 - Processes for forming photovoltaic conductive features from multiple inks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.02.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.03.2016 [2016/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CABOT CORPORATION Two Seaport Lane Suite 1300 Boston, Massachusetts 02210-2019 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2012/36] | For all designated states CABOT CORPORATION Two Seaport Lane, Suite 1300 Boston, Massachusetts 02210-2019 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hampden-Smith, Mark, J. 5808 Padre Roberto NW Albuquerque, NM 87107 / US | 02 /
Kowalski, Mark, H. 9215 Ventura St. NE Albuquerque, NM 87122 / US | [2012/36] | Representative(s) | Serravalle, Marco Serravalle SAS Via G. Matteotti, 21/23 26854 Cornegliano Laudense (LO) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2012/36] | Serravalle, Marco Serravalle SAS Via Matteotti, 21/23 26854 Cornegliano Laudense (LO) / IT | Application number, filing date | 12162816.8 | 05.12.2008 | [2012/36] | Priority number, date | US20070952580 | 07.12.2007 Original published format: US 952580 | [2012/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2495768 | Date: | 05.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2495768 | Date: | 06.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/0224, H01L31/18 | [2012/36] | CPC: |
H01L31/022425 (EP,US);
H01L31/1868 (EP,US);
Y02E10/50 (EP,US);
Y02P70/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/36] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Bildung von photovoltaischen Leitfähigkeitsmerkmalen aus mehreren Tinten | [2012/36] | English: | Processes for forming photovoltaic conductive features from multiple inks | [2012/36] | French: | Procédés de fabrication d'éléments conducteurs photovoltaiques à partir d'encres multiples | [2012/36] | Examination procedure | 25.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/15] | 08.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/12] | 16.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/12] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08859119.3 / EP2232568 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080859119) is 03.05.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2015 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2003071976 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003148024 (KODAS TOIVO T [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0158] - [0168] *; | [I]WO2005050673 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE], et al) [I] 1,3,4,6,7,12-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | US4390369 | US4567213 | US4877451 | WO9403546 | EP0745479 | EP0745651 | US5596027 | US5624485 | US5642141 | US5643356 | US5662286 | US5662736 | US5679724 | EP0805192 | US5725647 | US5750194 | US5786410 | US5837041 | US5837045 | US5853470 | EP0952195 | US2006165898 | US2007125989 | US20020265179 | US20060331231 | US20060331186 | US20060331237 | US20060331190 | US20060331239 | US20060331187 | US20060443131 |