EP2514504 - Air filtration media pack [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.04.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.12.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DONALDSON COMPANY, INC. 1400 West 94th Street Minneapolis, MN 55440 / US | [2012/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rocklitz, Gary J. 12724 Diamond Drive Burnsville, MN Minnesota 55337 / US | 02 /
Ouyang, Ming 10269 Bleeker Street Woodbury, MN Minnesota 55129 / US | 03 /
Mathew, Anitha M. TC 11/1432(2) NCRA 112 Nanthancode Trivandrum 695003 Kerala / IN | [2012/43] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1 20355 Hamburg / DE | [2018/22] |
Former [2012/43] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1 20355 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 12163091.7 | 04.02.2008 | [2012/43] | Priority number, date | US20070899311P | 02.02.2007 Original published format: US 899311 P | [2012/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2514504 | Date: | 24.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2514504 | Date: | 30.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B01D46/52 | [2012/43] | CPC: |
B01D46/522 (EP,US);
B01D46/526 (US);
B01D46/525 (EP,US);
B01D46/527 (US);
Y10T156/1016 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/22] |
Former [2012/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | LUFTFILTERMEDIENPACK | [2017/50] | English: | Air filtration media pack | [2012/43] | French: | PAQUET DE MATÉRIAUX FILTRANTS | [2017/50] |
Former [2012/43] | Luftfiltermedienpack | ||
Former [2012/43] | Paquet de matériaux filtrants | Examination procedure | 24.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/23] | 16.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.02.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 25.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.04.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08714184.2 / EP2117672 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080714184) is 26.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/19] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 25.04.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 25.04.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.05.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.02.2008 | AT | 30.05.2018 | CY | 30.05.2018 | CZ | 30.05.2018 | DK | 30.05.2018 | EE | 30.05.2018 | ES | 30.05.2018 | FI | 30.05.2018 | HR | 30.05.2018 | IT | 30.05.2018 | LT | 30.05.2018 | LV | 30.05.2018 | MC | 30.05.2018 | NL | 30.05.2018 | PL | 30.05.2018 | RO | 30.05.2018 | SE | 30.05.2018 | SI | 30.05.2018 | SK | 30.05.2018 | BG | 30.08.2018 | NO | 30.08.2018 | GR | 31.08.2018 | IS | 30.09.2018 | PT | 01.10.2018 | IE | 04.02.2019 | LU | 04.02.2019 | MT | 04.02.2019 | BE | 28.02.2019 | CH | 28.02.2019 | LI | 28.02.2019 | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/31] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
IS | 30.09.2018 | ||
PT | 01.10.2018 | ||
IE | 04.02.2019 | ||
LU | 04.02.2019 | ||
MT | 04.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
PT | 01.10.2018 | ||
IE | 04.02.2019 | ||
LU | 04.02.2019 | ||
MT | 04.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
IE | 04.02.2019 | ||
LU | 04.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
IE | 04.02.2019 | ||
LU | 04.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LU | 04.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LU | 04.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/45] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 30.05.2018 | |
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XDY]US5562825 (YAMADA KATSUHISA [JP], et al) [XD] 1,4,8,9 * abstract * [Y] 3,10-12; | [XDY]WO9740918 (DONALDSON CO INC [US]) [XD] 1,4,7-9 * abstract * * page 2, line 12 - page 3, line 3 * [Y] 3,10-12; | [YD]US6953124 (WINTER MANFRED [DE], et al) [YD] 3,10-12* abstract * | Examination | JPS6071018 | by applicant | US4925561 | US5049326 | US5562825 | US5613992 | WO9740918 | US5772883 | USD396098S | US5792247 | USD398046S | US5820646 | USD399944S | US5895574 | US5902364 | US6039778 | USD428128S | US6179890 | USD437401S | US6190432 | US6210469 | US6235195 | US6348084 | US6348085 | US6350296 | US6350291 | WO03047722 | US2003121845 | US6610126 | US6673136 | WO2004007054 | WO2004082795 | US2005166561 | WO2005077487 | US6953124 | US6955775 | WO2006013271 | US2006091084 | US2006151383 | WO2006076479 | WO2006076456 | US2006163150 | WO2007056589 | US7270693 | WO2007133635 | US20080025999 |