EP2479153 - LITHIUM SILICATE BLANK AND LITHIUM SILICATE GLASS PRECURSOR THEREOF FOR A DENTAL RESTORATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/30] | Lithium silicate materials | ||
[2020/02] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.05.2021 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ivoclar Vivadent AG Bendererstrasse 2 9494 Schaan / LI | [2012/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schweiger, Marcel Güterstraße 16 7000 Chur / CH | 02 /
Rheinberger, Volker M. Mareestraße 34 9490 Vaduz / LI | 03 /
Bürke, Harald Bardella 5a 6820 Frastanz / AT | 04 /
Höland, Wolfram Im Aescherle 26 9494 Schaan / LI | [2012/30] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstraße 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [2020/27] |
Former [2012/30] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 12163270.7 | 03.08.2004 | [2012/30] | Priority number, date | DE20031036913 | 07.08.2003 Original published format: DE 10336913 | [2012/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2479153 | Date: | 25.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2479153 | Date: | 24.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2479153 | Date: | 01.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C03C10/00, C03C3/097, C03C4/00, A61K6/027, A61K6/02, A61K6/00 | [2020/02] | CPC: |
C03C10/0027 (EP,US);
A61K6/833 (EP,US);
A61K6/78 (EP,US);
A61K6/807 (EP,US);
A61K6/818 (EP,US);
C03C10/0036 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/17] | C03C10/00, A61K6/027 | ||
Former IPC [2012/30] | C03C10/04, A61K6/06, C03C10/00, A61K6/027 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2020/27] |
Former [2012/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | LITHIUMSILIKATROHLING UND DESSEN LITHIUMSILIKATGLASVORSTUFE FÜR EINE ZAHNRESTAURATION | [2020/05] | English: | LITHIUM SILICATE BLANK AND LITHIUM SILICATE GLASS PRECURSOR THEREOF FOR A DENTAL RESTORATION | [2020/05] | French: | BLANC À BASE DE SILICATE DE LITHIUM ET PRÉCURSEUR DE VERRE AU SILICATE DE LITHIUM POUR UNE RESTAURATION DENTAIRE | [2020/05] |
Former [2012/30] | Lithiumsilicat-Materialien | ||
Former [2012/30] | Lithium silicate materials | ||
Former [2012/30] | Matériaux en silicate de lithium | Examination procedure | 24.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.10.2013 | Examination requested [2013/49] | 29.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.04.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 16.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.12.2019 | 06.12.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 10.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.05.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04018339.4 / EP1505041 | Opposition(s) | 06.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/23] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 16.06.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 16.06.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.06.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 13.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 16.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 14.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.08.2004 | CY | 01.07.2020 | CZ | 01.07.2020 | DK | 01.07.2020 | EE | 01.07.2020 | FI | 01.07.2020 | MC | 01.07.2020 | PL | 01.07.2020 | RO | 01.07.2020 | SE | 01.07.2020 | SI | 01.07.2020 | SK | 01.07.2020 | TR | 01.07.2020 | IE | 03.08.2020 | LU | 03.08.2020 | BE | 31.08.2020 | BG | 01.10.2020 | GR | 02.10.2020 | PT | 02.11.2020 | [2022/27] |
Former [2022/26] | CZ | 01.07.2020 | |
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SI | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
TR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IE | 03.08.2020 | ||
LU | 03.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | CZ | 01.07.2020 | |
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SI | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
IE | 03.08.2020 | ||
LU | 03.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | CZ | 01.07.2020 | |
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SI | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
LU | 03.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | CZ | 01.07.2020 | |
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
LU | 03.08.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 01.07.2020 | |
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
LU | 03.08.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | CZ | 01.07.2020 | |
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
LU | 03.08.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/18] | CZ | 01.07.2020 | |
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | CZ | 01.07.2020 | |
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | CZ | 01.07.2020 | |
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 01.07.2020 | |
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | BG | 01.10.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3816704 (BOROM M, et al) [A] 1-15 * column 7, line 49 - column 8, line 5; example -; claim - *; | [X]EP0827941 (IVOCLAR AG [LI]) [X] 1-15 * example -; claim - * * page 4, line 20 - line 31 * * page 6, line 11 - line 13 * * page 5, line 44 - line 46 *; | [XD]DE19750794 (IVOCLAR AG [LI]) [XD] 1-15 * example -; claim - *; | [X]US6455451 (BRODKIN DMITRI [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * example -; claim - *; | [X] - VON CLAUSBRUCH S C ET AL, "The effect of P2O5 on the crystallization and microstructure of glass-ceramics in the SiO2-Li2O-K2O-ZnO-P2O5 system", JOURNAL OF NON-CRYSTALLINE SOLIDS, NORTH-HOLLAND PUBLISHING COMPANY, AMSTERDAM, NL, (200003), vol. 263-264, ISSN 0022-3093, pages 388 - 394, XP004190686 [X] 1,15 * page 393, column R - page 394; table - * | [X] - CRAMER VON CLAUSBRUCH S ET AL, "EFFECT OF ZNO ON THE CRYSTALLIZATION, MICROSTRUCTURE AND PROPERTIES OF GLASS-CERAMICS IN THE SIO2-LI2O-ZNO-K2O-P2O5 SYSTEM EINFLUSS VON ZNO AUF KRISTALLISATION, GEFUEGE UND EIGENSCHAFTEN VON GLASKERAMIKEN IM SYSTEM SIO2-LI2O-ZNO-K2O-P2O5", TECNICA E INVENCION, TECNICA E INVENCION. MADRID, ES, (200108), vol. 74, no. 8, pages 223 - 229, XP001096785 [X] 1,15 * page 228 - page 229; figure 3; table 1 * | [A] - OLIVEIRA DE A P N ET AL, "SINTERING AND CRYSTALLIZATION OF A GLASS POWDER IN THE LI2O-ZRO2- SIO2 SYSTEM", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CERAMIC SOCIETY, AMERICAN CERAMIC SOCIETY. COLUMBUS, US, (199803), vol. 81, no. 3, ISSN 0002-7820, pages 777 - 780, XP000738310 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2684911 | DE2451121 | DE19750794 | EP0817597 | EP0774933 | - S.D. STOOKEY, "Chemical Machining of Photosensitive Glass", IND. ENG. CHEM., (1993), vol. 45, pages 115 - 118 | - S.D. STOOKEY, PHOTOSEN- SITIVELY OPACIFIABLE GLASS | - M.-P. BOROM; A.M. TURKALO; R.H. DOREMUS, "Strength and Microstructure in Lithium Disilicate Glass-Ceramics", J. AM. CEREAM. SOC., (1975), vol. 58, no. 9-10, pages 385 - 391 |