EP2514646 - Wheel brake for a drum-braked vehicle and expander device for a drum brake [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.03.2018 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.04.2018 [2018/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BPW FAHRZEUGTECHNIK GmbH & CO. KG Pater-Ewald-Strasse 29 33104 Paderborn / DE | [2012/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Müller, Matthias Ruth-Scheye-Weg 19 51105 Köln / DE | 02 /
Heidrich, Philipp Hummerntruper Straße 52 a 32657 Lemgo / DE | 03 /
Kamm, Michael Aachener Straße 53 52223 Stolberg / DE | 04 /
Klein, Karsten Bitzenweg 35 51580 Reichshof / DE | 05 /
Morfeld, Alfons Auf dem Busche 80 a 33129 Delbrück / DE | [2012/43] | Representative(s) | Christophersen & Partner Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Homberger Strasse 5 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/43] | Christophersen & Partner Patentanwälte Homberger Strasse 5 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 12163283.0 | 05.04.2012 | [2012/43] | Priority number, date | DE20111002121 | 18.04.2011 Original published format: DE102011002121 | [2012/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2514646 | Date: | 24.10.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2514646 | Date: | 20.03.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B60T7/20, F16D51/48, F16D65/56, F16D51/20 | [2013/12] | CPC: |
B60T7/206 (EP);
F16D51/20 (EP);
F16D65/562 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2012/43] | B60T7/20, F16D51/48, F16D65/56 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Radbremse für ein trommelgebremstes Fahrzeug sowie Spreizschloss für eine Trommelbremse | [2012/43] | English: | Wheel brake for a drum-braked vehicle and expander device for a drum brake | [2012/43] | French: | Frein de roue pour un véhicule avec frein à tambour ainsi que écarteur pour un frein à tambour | [2012/43] | Examination procedure | 19.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/22] | 03.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/15] | 28.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/15] | Divisional application(s) | EP13168710.5 / EP2631504 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2017 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2275086 (ALLEN PATRICIA ISABEL MARGARET [GB]) [A] 1-12 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 4, line 24 - page 7, line 34 * * page 13, line 9 - page 16, line 33; figures 1-5 *; | [YA]DE102009036222 (KNOTT GMBH [DE]) [Y] 13-15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] , [0005] - [0008] - [0021] - [0035]; figures 1-15 * [A] 1-12; | [A]EP0210788 (LUCAS IND PLC [GB]) [A] 1-12 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 4, line 30 - page 8, line 5; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US3712425 (TORII T, et al) [A] 1-12 * column 2, line 38 - column 7, line 19; figures 1-6 *; | [X]US3805926 (CLAY B, et al) [X] 13-15 * column 2, line 13 - column 3, line 51; figures 1-4 *; | [Y]US3540554 (BURNETT RICHARD T, et al) [Y] 13-15 * column 1, lines 29-34 * * column 1, line 60 - column 2, line 30; figures 1-6 * | by applicant | EP0482430 | WO2007093399 |