EP2487739 - Method for producing a bipolar plate and bipolar plate for a bipolar battery [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ElringKlinger AG Max-Eyth-Strasse 2 72581 Dettingen / DE | [2012/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schlipf, Michael Putzenlehnerstrasse 22 84508 Burgkirchen / DE | 02 /
Zahn, Helmut Kleinkuchener Berg 19 89520 Heidenheim / DE | [2012/39] |
Former [2012/33] | 01 /
Schlipf, Michael Putzenlehnerstrasse 22 84508 Burgkirchen / DE | ||
02 /
Zahn, Helmut Badenbergstrasse 15 89520 Heidenheim / DE | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/33] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 12163291.3 | 28.07.2009 | [2012/33] | Priority number, date | DE20081036319 | 29.07.2008 Original published format: DE102008036319 | [2012/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2487739 | Date: | 15.08.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2487739 | Date: | 08.01.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/66, H01M4/68 | [2012/33] | CPC: |
H01M4/68 (EP);
H01M4/661 (EP);
H01M4/667 (EP);
H01M4/668 (EP);
H01M4/685 (EP);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y02P70/50 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/33] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Bipolarplatte und Bipolarplatte für eine bipolare Batterie | [2012/33] | English: | Method for producing a bipolar plate and bipolar plate for a bipolar battery | [2012/33] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'une plaque bipolaire et plaque bipolaire pour une batterie bipolaire | [2012/33] | Examination procedure | 14.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/13] | 18.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09166612.3 / EP2157641 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20090166612) is 29.10.2012 | Opposition(s) | 09.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.07.2009 | BG | 08.01.2014 | CY | 08.01.2014 | CZ | 08.01.2014 | DK | 08.01.2014 | EE | 08.01.2014 | ES | 08.01.2014 | FI | 08.01.2014 | HR | 08.01.2014 | IT | 08.01.2014 | LT | 08.01.2014 | LV | 08.01.2014 | MC | 08.01.2014 | MK | 08.01.2014 | MT | 08.01.2014 | NL | 08.01.2014 | PL | 08.01.2014 | RO | 08.01.2014 | SE | 08.01.2014 | SI | 08.01.2014 | SK | 08.01.2014 | SM | 08.01.2014 | TR | 08.01.2014 | NO | 08.04.2014 | GR | 09.04.2014 | IS | 08.05.2014 | PT | 08.05.2014 | AT | 28.07.2014 | GB | 28.07.2014 | IE | 28.07.2014 | LU | 28.07.2014 | BE | 31.07.2014 | CH | 31.07.2014 | LI | 31.07.2014 | [2018/31] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 28.07.2009 | |
BG | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
IT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
MT | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
SM | 08.01.2014 | ||
TR | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
GR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
AT | 28.07.2014 | ||
GB | 28.07.2014 | ||
IE | 28.07.2014 | ||
LU | 28.07.2014 | ||
BE | 31.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 28.07.2009 | |
BG | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
IT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
MT | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
SM | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
GR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
AT | 28.07.2014 | ||
GB | 28.07.2014 | ||
IE | 28.07.2014 | ||
LU | 28.07.2014 | ||
BE | 31.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/29] | BG | 08.01.2014 | |
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
IT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
MT | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
SM | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
GR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
AT | 28.07.2014 | ||
GB | 28.07.2014 | ||
IE | 28.07.2014 | ||
LU | 28.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 08.01.2014 | |
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
MT | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
SM | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
GR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
AT | 28.07.2014 | ||
GB | 28.07.2014 | ||
IE | 28.07.2014 | ||
LU | 28.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
SM | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
AT | 28.07.2014 | ||
GB | 28.07.2014 | ||
IE | 28.07.2014 | ||
LU | 28.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/21] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
AT | 28.07.2014 | ||
GB | 28.07.2014 | ||
IE | 28.07.2014 | ||
LU | 28.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/51] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
AT | 28.07.2014 | ||
GB | 28.07.2014 | ||
IE | 28.07.2014 | ||
LU | 28.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
GB | 28.07.2014 | ||
IE | 28.07.2014 | ||
LU | 28.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
GB | 28.07.2014 | ||
LU | 28.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
LU | 28.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/13] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
LU | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 08.01.2014 | |
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5800946 (GROSVENOR VICTOR L [US], et al) [X] 14 * column 5, lines 17-48 - column 7, lines 65-67 * * column 8, lines 26-30; claims 1,5 * [Y] 1-13; | [XY]US4892797 (RAO BHASKARA M L [US], et al) [X] 14 * column 2, lines 10-14,34-59 - column 3, lines 7-12 * [Y] 1-13; | [Y]DE10117985 (RENNEBECK KLAUS [DE]) [Y] 1-13 * column 1, lines 5-8,15-18,37-38 *; | [A]US6500585 (SAAKES MACHIEL [NL], et al) [A] 1-14 * column 3, lines 21-27 - column 4, lines 32-37 *; | [A]US5348817 (RAO PURUSHOTHAMA [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO9840920 | WO0008071 | WO0160911 |