EP2650424 - A laundry treatment machine including a front panel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.09.2014 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.10.2014 [2014/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Electrolux Home Products Corporation N.V. Raketstraat 40 1130 Brussels / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/42] | For all designated states Electrolux Home Products Corporation N.V. Raketstraat 40 1130 Brussel / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Santarossa, Marco c/o Electrolux Italia S.p.A. Corso Lino Zanussi 30 33080 Porcia (PN) / IT | 02 /
Dal Ben, Diego c/o Electrolux Italia S.p.A. Corso Lino Zanussi 30 33080 Porcia (PN) / IT | [2013/42] | Representative(s) | Nardoni, Andrea Electrolux Italia S.p.A. Corso Lino Zanussi, 30 33080 Porcia (PN) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2013/42] | Nardoni, Andrea Electrolux Italia S.p.A. Corso Lino Zanussi, 30 33080 Porcia (PN) / IT | Application number, filing date | 12163920.7 | 12.04.2012 | [2013/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2650424 | Date: | 16.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | D06F39/14, D06F58/00 | [2013/42] | CPC: |
D06F39/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Wäschebehandlungsmaschine mit Frontplatte | [2013/42] | English: | A laundry treatment machine including a front panel | [2013/42] | French: | Machine de traitement du linge comprenant un panneau avant | [2013/42] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/42] | 28.05.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/42] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2014 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH0898994 (TOKYO GAS CO LTD) [Y] 1-15 * abstract *; | [Y]AU1913588 (ANTHONY ROBERT CAMPBELL) [Y] 1-15 * page 6, paragraphs 1,2; figure 6 *; | [A]JP2001010549 (NISSAN DIESEL MOTOR CO) [A] 1-5 * abstract *; | [A]US4947937 (SEARER FLOYD A [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * figure 8 *; | [A]US2629243 (HALLANDER ELVIN E) [A] 1-5,10,11 * column 3, lines 9-25; figures 1,2 *; | [A]JP2005204970 (TOSHIBA CORP, et al) [A] 1-5,10,11 * abstract *; | [A]KR20030037783 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-5 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2008264574 (SPIESS PETER A [CH]) [A] 1-5 * figures 1,2a,2b * |