EP2515543 - Image capturing apparatus and image capturing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.01.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2018/08] |
Former [2012/43] | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okada, Daisuke c/o Ricoh Company, Limited 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 02 /
Shiraishi, Kenji c/o Ricoh Company, Limited 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2012/43] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/08] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2012/43] | Forsythe, Dominic J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 12164456.1 | 17.04.2012 | [2012/43] | Priority number, date | JP20110092336 | 18.04.2011 Original published format: JP 2011092336 | [2012/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2515543 | Date: | 24.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2515543 | Date: | 18.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2515543 | Date: | 21.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04N9/04, H04N5/355 | [2012/43] | CPC: |
H04N23/62 (EP);
H04N23/84 (EP,US);
H04N25/57 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/43] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Bilderfassung | [2012/43] | English: | Image capturing apparatus and image capturing method | [2012/43] | French: | Appareil et procédé de capture d'image | [2018/08] |
Former [2012/43] | Appareil et procédé de capture dýimage | Examination procedure | 17.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/43] | 05.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.01.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.07.2015 | Opposition(s) | 22.11.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.04.2012 | AL | 21.02.2018 | AT | 21.02.2018 | CY | 21.02.2018 | CZ | 21.02.2018 | DK | 21.02.2018 | EE | 21.02.2018 | ES | 21.02.2018 | FI | 21.02.2018 | HR | 21.02.2018 | IT | 21.02.2018 | LT | 21.02.2018 | LV | 21.02.2018 | MC | 21.02.2018 | MK | 21.02.2018 | NL | 21.02.2018 | PL | 21.02.2018 | PT | 21.02.2018 | RO | 21.02.2018 | RS | 21.02.2018 | SE | 21.02.2018 | SI | 21.02.2018 | SK | 21.02.2018 | SM | 21.02.2018 | TR | 21.02.2018 | IE | 17.04.2018 | LU | 17.04.2018 | MT | 17.04.2018 | BE | 30.04.2018 | CH | 30.04.2018 | LI | 30.04.2018 | BG | 21.05.2018 | NO | 21.05.2018 | GR | 22.05.2018 | IS | 21.06.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 17.04.2012 | |
AL | 21.02.2018 | ||
AT | 21.02.2018 | ||
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
MK | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PT | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
SM | 21.02.2018 | ||
TR | 21.02.2018 | ||
IE | 17.04.2018 | ||
LU | 17.04.2018 | ||
MT | 17.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 17.04.2012 | |
AL | 21.02.2018 | ||
AT | 21.02.2018 | ||
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PT | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
SM | 21.02.2018 | ||
TR | 21.02.2018 | ||
IE | 17.04.2018 | ||
LU | 17.04.2018 | ||
MT | 17.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
AT | 21.02.2018 | ||
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
SM | 21.02.2018 | ||
TR | 21.02.2018 | ||
IE | 17.04.2018 | ||
LU | 17.04.2018 | ||
MT | 17.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
AT | 21.02.2018 | ||
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
SM | 21.02.2018 | ||
IE | 17.04.2018 | ||
LU | 17.04.2018 | ||
MT | 17.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
AT | 21.02.2018 | ||
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
SM | 21.02.2018 | ||
IE | 17.04.2018 | ||
LU | 17.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
AT | 21.02.2018 | ||
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SI | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
SM | 21.02.2018 | ||
LU | 17.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
AT | 21.02.2018 | ||
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
SM | 21.02.2018 | ||
LU | 17.04.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
AT | 21.02.2018 | ||
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
MC | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
SM | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
AT | 21.02.2018 | ||
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
DK | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
AT | 21.02.2018 | ||
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2018 | ||
EE | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
PL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RO | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
SK | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
AT | 21.02.2018 | ||
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
IT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 21.02.2018 | |
AT | 21.02.2018 | ||
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
BG | 21.05.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 21.02.2018 | |
CY | 21.02.2018 | ||
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
LV | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
RS | 21.02.2018 | ||
SE | 21.02.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 21.02.2018 | |
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
GR | 22.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 21.02.2018 | |
ES | 21.02.2018 | ||
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 21.02.2018 | |
FI | 21.02.2018 | ||
HR | 21.02.2018 | ||
LT | 21.02.2018 | ||
NL | 21.02.2018 | ||
NO | 21.05.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006221201 (CHIEN CHIEN-CHIA [TW], et al); | [Y]US2010171842 (SHIRAISHI KENJI [JP]); | [Y]US2011001841 (SHIRAISHI KENJI [JP], et al); | [Y]WO2011042229 (IBM [US], et al) | by applicant | JP2009089355 |