EP2517837 - Head and handle assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/44] | Hammer head and handle assembly | ||
[2013/31] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.04.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JPW Industries Inc. 427 New Sanford Road La Vergne, TN 37086-4184 / US | [2014/25] |
Former [2012/44] | For all designated states Walter Meier (Manufacturing), Inc. 427 New Sanford Road La Vergne, TN 37086-4184 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Onello, Timothy Scott 3025 Rincon Ct. Murfreesboro, TN Tennessee 37127 / US | 02 /
Weber, Charles 928 Park Place Onalaska, WI Wisconsin 54650 / US | [2012/44] | Representative(s) | Lawrence, John Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/44] | Lawrence, John Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 12164515.4 | 17.04.2012 | [2012/44] | Priority number, date | US201113093540 | 25.04.2011 Original published format: US201113093540 | [2012/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2517837 | Date: | 31.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2517837 | Date: | 28.11.2012 | [2012/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2517837 | Date: | 18.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B25D1/14, B25G1/02, B25G3/32, B29C45/14, // B29L31/28 | [2013/31] | CPC: |
B25D1/14 (EP,US);
B25G3/32 (EP,US);
B29C45/14549 (EP,US);
B25D2250/211 (EP,US);
B29C2045/14877 (EP,US);
B29L2031/283 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/48] | B25D1/14, B25G1/02, B25G3/32, B29C45/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/44] | Title | German: | Kopf- und Griffanordnung | [2013/47] | English: | Head and handle assembly | [2013/31] | French: | Ensemble de tête et manche | [2013/31] |
Former [2012/44] | Hammerkopf- und -griffanordnung | ||
Former [2012/44] | Hammer head and handle assembly | ||
Former [2012/44] | Ensemble de tête de marteau et manche | Examination procedure | 28.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/28] | 11.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 07.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP14162149.0 / EP2749379 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.10.2013 | Opposition(s) | 19.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/22] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 07.05.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 07.05.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.05.2014 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 12.06.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 12.06.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.06.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.04.2012 | AL | 18.06.2014 | AT | 18.06.2014 | BE | 18.06.2014 | BG | 18.06.2014 | CY | 18.06.2014 | CZ | 18.06.2014 | DK | 18.06.2014 | EE | 18.06.2014 | FI | 18.06.2014 | HR | 18.06.2014 | IT | 18.06.2014 | LT | 18.06.2014 | LV | 18.06.2014 | MC | 18.06.2014 | MK | 18.06.2014 | MT | 18.06.2014 | NL | 18.06.2014 | RO | 18.06.2014 | RS | 18.06.2014 | SE | 18.06.2014 | SI | 18.06.2014 | SK | 18.06.2014 | SM | 18.06.2014 | TR | 18.06.2014 | NO | 18.09.2014 | GR | 19.09.2014 | IS | 18.10.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 17.04.2012 | |
AT | 18.06.2014 | ||
BE | 18.06.2014 | ||
BG | 18.06.2014 | ||
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
MK | 18.06.2014 | ||
MT | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
SM | 18.06.2014 | ||
TR | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 17.04.2012 | |
AT | 18.06.2014 | ||
BE | 18.06.2014 | ||
BG | 18.06.2014 | ||
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
MT | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
SM | 18.06.2014 | ||
TR | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
BE | 18.06.2014 | ||
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
MT | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/01] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
BE | 18.06.2014 | ||
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
BE | 18.06.2014 | ||
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
BE | 18.06.2014 | ||
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/52] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 18.06.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]BE412342 (RÜCKERT & BÄR) [X] 10 * figures 1-3 * [A] 1-9,11-15; | [XA]US1269555 (GUNNING JOHN [US]) [X] 10,11 * figures 1,3,4 * [A] 1-9,12-15; | [XA]US2920667 (SHELTON LESLIE C) [X] 10 * column 1, line 56 - column 2, line 26; figures 1-3 * [A] 1-9,11-15; | [XA]US2980154 (WILLIAMSON JAMES W) [X] 10 * figures 1,2 * [A] 1-9,11-15; | [XA]US3786847 (SCHERA E) [X] 10 * figures 1,2 * [A] 1-9,11-15; | [XA]EP0005635 (UPHAM AND BENDT N V [NL]) [X] 10 * page 4, line 14 - page 7, line 13; figures 1-6 * [A] 1-9,11-15; | [A]GB2053771 (WHITEFORD C L) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US4331193 (TUDISCO VINCENT J) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0207786 (YANG TAI HER) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [YA]US4683784 (LAMONT PATRICK A [ZA]) [Y] 15 * column 2, line 31 - column 3, line 16; figures 1-3 * [A] 1-14; | [Y]EP0248567 (BRITZ JOHANNES H) [Y] 15 * column 3, lines 7-15; figure 1 *; | [A]US4890518 (FLOYD TED J [US]) [A] 6,11* column 1, lines 61-64; figure 4 *; | [XA]FR2814975 (LEBORGNE [FR]) [X] 10 * figures 1-7 * [A] 1-9,11-15; | [XA]EP1782926 (AUSTRALIAN S R L [IT]) [X] 10 * figure 1 * [A] 1-9,11-15; | [XA]CA2602874 (ILIEVSKI BORIS [CA]) [X] 10 * figures 1,4 * [A] 1-9,11-15 |