EP2653350 - Vehicle network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.09.2014 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.10.2014 [2014/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2013/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Feld, Joachim Schussleitenweg 58 90451 Nürnberg / DE | [2013/43] | Application number, filing date | 12164601.2 | 18.04.2012 | [2013/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2653350 | Date: | 23.10.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B60R16/023, G07C5/08 | [2013/43] | CPC: |
B60R16/0234 (EP);
G07C5/0808 (EP);
G07C2205/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Fahrzeugnetz | [2013/43] | English: | Vehicle network | [2013/43] | French: | Réseau de véhicule | [2013/43] | Examination procedure | 24.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/43] | 02.06.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/43] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2014 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE202006003273U (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1-5,7 * paragraphs [0037] , [0042]; figures 3,6 * [I] 6; | [X]DE10235525 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [X] 7 * page 3, lines 37-46; figure 1 *; | [X]EP1796051 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE], et al) [X] 7 * paragraphs [0004] , [0005] , [0007] , [0008]; figure 2 *; | [X]WO03027629 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [X] 7 * page 12, line 6 - page 13, line 1; figure 1 *; | [A]US2010256861 (HODGES THOMAS A [US]) [A] 1,7 * paragraph [0058]; figure 2 * |