EP2514409 - Topical pharmaceutical compositions of nimesulide and methylsulfonylmethane [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 17.10.2014 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2014 | Refusal of application | published on 19.11.2014 [2014/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanovel Ilaç Sanayi Ve Ticaret Anonim Sirketi Istinye Mah. Balabandere Cad. No:14 34460 Sariyer/Istanbul / TR | [2012/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cifter, Ümit Sanovel Ilac Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S. Balabandere Cad. Ilac Sanayi Yolu No: 14 Istinye-Sariyer 34460 Istanbul / TR | 02 /
Türkyilmaz, Ali Sanovel Ilac Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S. Balabandere Cad. Ilac Sanayi Yolu No: 14 Istinye-Sariyer 34460 Istanbul / TR | 03 /
Önder, Ramazan Sanovel Ilac Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S. Balabandere Cad. Ilac Sanayi Yolu No: 14 Istinye-Sariyer 34460 Istanbul / TR | [2012/43] | Representative(s) | Sevinç, Erkan, et al Istanbul Patent A.S. Plaza-33, Büyükdere Cad. No: 33/16 Sisli 34381 Istanbul / TR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/43] | Sevinç, Erkan, et al Istanbul Patent & Trademark Consultancy Ltd. Plaza 33, Buyukdere Cad. No: 33/16 Sisli 34381 Istanbul / TR | Application number, filing date | 12164607.9 | 18.04.2012 | [2012/43] | Priority number, date | TR20110003770 | 19.04.2011 Original published format: TR 201103770 | [2012/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2514409 | Date: | 24.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/00, A61K31/10, A61K31/18, A61K45/06, A61K47/18, A61K47/20, A61K47/32, A61P29/00 | [2012/43] | CPC: |
A61K31/10 (EP,US);
A61K31/18 (EP);
A61K45/06 (EP);
A61K47/20 (EP,US);
A61K47/32 (EP);
A61K9/0014 (EP);
A61K9/06 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61K47/10 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/10, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/18, A61K2300/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Topische pharmazeutische Zusammensetzungen aus Nimesulid und Methylsuflonylmethan | [2012/43] | English: | Topical pharmaceutical compositions of nimesulide and methylsulfonylmethane | [2012/43] | French: | Compositions pharmaceutiques locales de nimésulide et méthylsulfonylméthane | [2012/43] | Examination procedure | 24.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/23] | 29.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 06.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2014/47] | 10.07.2014 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2014/47] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.10.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP2292218 (SANOVEL ILAC SANAYI VE TICARET AS [TR]) [Y] 1-16 * paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0052] * * claim 14 * * paragraph [0026] * * claims 1-16 *; | [Y]US7291591 (FISHMAN ROBERT [US]) [Y] 1-16 * column 5, line 3 - line 6 *; | [Y]US6706257 (MCCOOK JOHN P [US], et al) [Y] 1-16 * the whole document * * paragraph [0009] *; | [Y]WO2008099397 (DERMA YOUNG LTD [IL], et al) [Y] 1-16 * page 8, paragraph 3 *; | [Y]US2008038219 (MOSBAUGH JAMES D [US], et al) [Y] 1-16 * claim 26 *; | [Y]US6399093 (PETRUS EDWARD J [US]) [Y] 1-16 * column 7, line 65 - page 8, line 19 * * column 8, lines 4-6 * * examples 1,5 * | by applicant | US6444234 | US6416772 |