EP2482181 - Multi-touch input discrimination [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.07.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.08.2013 [2013/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apple Inc. 1 Infinite Loop Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2012/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Westerman, Wayne Carl c/o Apple Inc. 1 Infinite Loop Cupertino, CA, 95014 / US | [2012/31] | Representative(s) | Lang, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/31] | Lang, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12164793.7 | 21.12.2007 | [2012/31] | Priority number, date | US20070619464 | 03.01.2007 Original published format: US 619464 | [2012/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2482181 | Date: | 01.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/048, G06K9/00 | [2012/31] | CPC: |
G06F3/04186 (EP);
G06F3/04166 (KR);
G06F3/041 (CN);
G06F3/04182 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/0304 (KR);
G06F3/0414 (CN,KR);
G06F3/0416 (CN);
G06F3/042 (CN,KR);
G06F3/044 (EP,CN,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/31] | Title | German: | Mehrfachberührungseingabeunterscheidung | [2012/31] | English: | Multi-touch input discrimination | [2012/31] | French: | Discrimination d'entrées multi-touches | [2012/31] | Examination procedure | 19.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/31] | 02.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/32] | 15.03.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/32] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07863193.4 / EP2102736 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070863193) is 19.04.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2012 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   25.03.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5479528 (SPEETER THOMAS H [US]) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * column 4, line 45 - column 8, line 49 *; | [A]WO9718547 (URE MICHAEL J [US]) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * page 9, line 23 - page 10, line 23 *; | [A]US2003214488 (KATOH TAKEHIRO [JP]) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0064] *; | [A]WO2005114369 (APPLE COMPUTER [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * page 8, lines 10-29 * * page 10, line 29 - page 12, line 19 * * page 26, line 12 - page 29, line 11 *; | [A]US2006044280 (HUDDLESTON WYATT A [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0010] - [0014] *; | [A]WO2006074289 (GESTURETEK INC [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * page 2, lines 1-5 * * page 10, line 28 - page 12, line 9 * * page 9, lines 3-18 *; | [I]US2006232567 (WESTERMAN WAYNE [US], et al) [I] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0104] - [0106] - [0120] * * paragraph [0123] * * paragraphs [0126] - [0130] * * paragraphs [0148] - [0162] * * paragraphs [0173] - [0188] * * paragraphs [0204] , [0205] *; | [A] - SYNAPTICS PILOTFISH, "ONYX", (20061125), pages 1 - 3, HTTP://WWW.SYNAPTICS.COM/, URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20061125030217/http://www.synaptics.com/products/pdf/onyx_concept.pdf, (20080527), XP002481786 [A] 1-6 * the whole document * | [A] - DUDA R O ET AL, Pattern Classification, INTRODUCTION, PATTERN CLASSIFICATION, NEW YORK, JOHN WILEY & SONS, US, PAGE(S) 1 - 13, (20010101), ISBN 978-0-471-05669-0, XP002365458 [A] 1-6 * the whole document * |