EP2515525 - Image pickup apparatus and control method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.11.2015 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.12.2015 [2015/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2015/35] |
Former [2012/43] | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakagawa, Kazuo c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2012/43] | 01 /
Nakagawa, Kazuo c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo, Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2012/43] | Application number, filing date | 12164899.2 | 20.04.2012 | [2012/43] | Priority number, date | JP20110094620 | 21.04.2011 Original published format: JP 2011094620 | [2012/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2515525 | Date: | 24.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2515525 | Date: | 22.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/232 | [2012/43] | CPC: |
G02B7/285 (EP,US);
H04N23/672 (EP,US);
G02B7/34 (EP,US);
G02B7/36 (EP,US);
H04N23/673 (EP,US);
G03B13/36 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Bildaufnahmevorrichtung und Steuerungsverfahren dafür | [2012/43] | English: | Image pickup apparatus and control method thereof | [2012/43] | French: | Appareil de capture dýimages et son procédé de commande | [2012/43] | Examination procedure | 09.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/01] | 28.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/53] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.07.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1351086 (CANON KK [JP]) [Y] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [Y]JP2007065002 (CANON KK) [Y] 2-6 * the whole document *; | [Y]JP2008039976 (CANON KK) [Y] 2-6 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2008267601 (KOBAYASHI KAZUYA [JP]) [Y] 2-6 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0008] ** paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0041] *; | [IY]US2009245777 (SHIBUNO KOJI [JP], et al) [I] 1-7 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0067] * * paragraph [0086] - paragraph [0087] * * paragraph [0092] - paragraph [0093] * * paragraph [0125] * [Y] 1-7; | [IY]US2009245778 (SHIBUNO KOJI [JP], et al) [I] 1-7 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0089] * [Y] 1-7 | by applicant | JP2003295047 | JP2009139728 |