EP2522916 - Air conditioning module [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.10.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.12.2014 [2014/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Harreither, Raimund Markt 176 3334 Gaflenz / AT | [2012/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2012/46] | Representative(s) | Margotti, Herwig Franz Schwarz & Partner Patentanwälte Wipplingerstrasse 30 1010 Wien / AT | [2012/46] | Application number, filing date | 12165098.0 | 23.04.2012 | [2012/46] | Priority number, date | AT20110000263U | 09.05.2011 Original published format: AT 26311 U | [2013/10] |
Former [2012/46] | AT20110026320U | 09.05.2011 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2522916 | Date: | 14.11.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2522916 | Date: | 02.10.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F24D3/14, F28F1/02, F16L9/00 | [2012/46] | CPC: |
F24D3/14 (EP);
F28F3/12 (EP);
Y02B30/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Klimamodul | [2012/46] | English: | Air conditioning module | [2012/46] | French: | Module de climatisation | [2012/46] | Examination procedure | 03.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/49] | 19.05.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/49] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2014 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2004113797 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,5-9 * the whole document * [I] 3,4; | [X]KR950006363 (SINHONGSIK) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [A]WO03031877 (HERBST DONALD [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]GB2440161 (DISCRETEHEAT COMPANY LTD [GB]) [A] 1 * abstract * |