EP2523141 - Method for determining multiple identities, and a corresponding server and terminal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 01.07.2016 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2016 | Refusal of application | published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL LUCENT 148/152 route de la Reine 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [2014/34] |
Former [2012/46] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3, avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hacid, Hakim Alcatel Lucent Bell Labs France Centre de Villarceaux Route de Villejust 91620 Nozay / FR | 02 /
Maag, Maria Coralia Laura Alcatel Lucent Bell Labs France Centre de Villarceaux Route de Villejust 91620 Nozay / FR | 03 /
Skraba, Ryan AL Bell Labs France Centre de Villarceaux Route de Villejust 91620 Nozay / FR | [2012/46] | Representative(s) | Croonenbroek, Thomas Jakob Innovincia 11, avenue des Tilleuls 74200 Thonon-les-Bains / FR | [2013/27] |
Former [2012/46] | Mouney, Jérôme Alcatel-Lucent International 32, avenue Kléber 92700 Colombes / FR | Application number, filing date | 12165253.1 | 24.04.2012 | [2012/46] | Priority number, date | FR20110001466 | 13.05.2011 Original published format: FR 1101466 | [2012/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2523141 | Date: | 14.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/00, G06F17/30 | [2012/46] | CPC: |
G06F21/31 (EP);
G06F21/316 (EP);
G06F21/554 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Bestimmung mehrer Identitäten und zugehöriger Server und Endgerät | [2012/46] | English: | Method for determining multiple identities, and a corresponding server and terminal | [2012/46] | French: | Procédé pour déterminer des identités multiples et serveur et terminal correspondants | [2012/46] | Examination procedure | 16.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/21] | 28.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/31] | 11.03.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/31] | 18.03.2016 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.10.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2016 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | deleted | [2014/47] |
Former [2013/40] | ID: | 01 | |
For: | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR | ||
Date: | 10.04.2013 | ||
[2014/47] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2001054151 (WHEELER DAVID B [US], et al) [Y] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5666442 (WHEELER DAVID BRIAN [US]) [Y] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A] - LEYLA BILGE ET AL, "All your contacts are belong to us", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 18TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON WORLD WIDE WEB, WWW '09, New York, New York, USA, (20090101), doi:10.1145/1526709.1526784, ISBN 978-1-60-558487-4, page 551, XP055016412 [A] 1-17 * paragraph [02.1] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1526709.1526784 | [A] - Mary Derosa, "Data mining and data analysis for counterterrorism", Washington, D.C., U.S.A., ISBN 978-0-89-206443-4, (20040301), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20071219072732/http://911myths.com/images/e/e8/Data_Mining_CSIS.pdf, (20120113), XP055016449 [A] 1-17 * page 5 - page 6 * * page 9 - page 10 * | [A] - Robin Bloor ET AL, "The Business Applications of Identity Resolution", Waltham, MA, U.S.A., (20060309), URL: www.hurwitz.com, (20120113), XP055016463 [A] 1-17 * page 2 * |