EP2482100 - System and method for reducing ambiguities in received SPS signals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2012/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pon, Rayman Wai c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA, 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
Farmer, Dominic Gerard c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA, 92121-1714 / US | [2012/31] | Representative(s) | Wegner, Hans Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/46] | Wegner, Hans Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/31] | Wegner, Hans Bardehle Pagenberg Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12165708.4 | 23.08.2007 | [2012/31] | Priority number, date | US20060839854P | 23.08.2006 Original published format: US 839854 P | US20070842759 | 21.08.2007 Original published format: US 842759 | [2012/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2482100 | Date: | 01.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2482100 | Date: | 13.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G01S19/33, G01S19/24 | [2012/31] | CPC: |
G01S19/33 (EP,US);
G01S5/14 (KR);
G01S1/00 (KR);
G01S19/243 (EP,US);
G01S19/252 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/31] | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur mehrdeutigkeitsreduktion bei empfangenen SPS-Signalen | [2012/31] | English: | System and method for reducing ambiguities in received SPS signals | [2012/31] | French: | Système et procédé pour réduire des ambiguïtés dans des signaux sps reçus | [2012/31] | Examination procedure | 26.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/31] | 01.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07841292.1 / EP2062065 | Opposition(s) | 14.08.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.08.2007 | AT | 13.11.2013 | BE | 13.11.2013 | BG | 13.11.2013 | CY | 13.11.2013 | CZ | 13.11.2013 | DK | 13.11.2013 | EE | 13.11.2013 | ES | 13.11.2013 | FI | 13.11.2013 | IT | 13.11.2013 | LT | 13.11.2013 | LV | 13.11.2013 | MC | 13.11.2013 | MT | 13.11.2013 | NL | 13.11.2013 | PL | 13.11.2013 | RO | 13.11.2013 | SE | 13.11.2013 | SI | 13.11.2013 | SK | 13.11.2013 | TR | 13.11.2013 | GR | 14.02.2014 | IS | 13.03.2014 | PT | 13.03.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 23.08.2007 | |
AT | 13.11.2013 | ||
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
BG | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
IT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
MT | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
PL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RO | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
GR | 14.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
BG | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
IT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
MT | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
PL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RO | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
GR | 14.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
BG | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
IT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
PL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RO | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
IT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
PL | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
PL | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
PL | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
PL | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
PL | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 13.11.2013 | |
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 13.11.2013 | |
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 13.11.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9944073 (ERICSSON INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * page 5, line 7 - line 17 * * page 9, line 24 - line 29 * * page 11, line 4 - page 14, line 14 *; | [A]EP1146349 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0040] *; | [A]WO2004063763 (GLOBAL LOCATE INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0086] - paragraph [0091] *; | [A]WO2006067538 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [A] 1-15* page 15, line 23 - page 16, line 15 * | by applicant | WO9944073 | WO2004063763 | WO2006067538 |