EP2658190 - Electronic device and method for updating message recipients based on message body indicators [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.06.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 2200 University Avenue East Waterloo, ON N2K 0A7 / CA | [2013/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Martin, Daryl Joseph 295 Phillip Street Extension 73946 Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA | 02 /
O'Neill, Conor Michael 295 Phillip Street Extension 77254 Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA | [2013/44] | Representative(s) | Moore, Barry, et al Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25/26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/44] | Moore, Barry, et al Hanna Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane Dublin 2 / IE | Application number, filing date | 12165771.2 | 26.04.2012 | [2013/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2658190 | Date: | 30.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2658190 | Date: | 06.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/58, G06Q10/10 | [2013/44] | CPC: |
G06Q10/107 (EP);
H04L51/48 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/44] | Title | German: | Elektronische Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Aktualisieren von Nachrichtenempfängern basierend auf Nachrichtenkörperindikatoren | [2013/44] | English: | Electronic device and method for updating message recipients based on message body indicators | [2013/44] | French: | Dispositif électronique et procédé de mise à jour de contenu du corps de message sur la base des changements de destinataire | [2013/44] | Examination procedure | 26.04.2012 | Examination requested [2013/44] | 07.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.12.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 09.04.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.04.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.12.2013 | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.04.2012 | AL | 06.08.2014 | AT | 06.08.2014 | BE | 06.08.2014 | CY | 06.08.2014 | CZ | 06.08.2014 | DK | 06.08.2014 | EE | 06.08.2014 | ES | 06.08.2014 | FI | 06.08.2014 | HR | 06.08.2014 | IT | 06.08.2014 | LT | 06.08.2014 | LV | 06.08.2014 | MC | 06.08.2014 | MK | 06.08.2014 | MT | 06.08.2014 | PL | 06.08.2014 | RO | 06.08.2014 | RS | 06.08.2014 | SE | 06.08.2014 | SI | 06.08.2014 | SK | 06.08.2014 | SM | 06.08.2014 | TR | 06.08.2014 | BG | 06.11.2014 | NO | 06.11.2014 | GR | 07.11.2014 | IS | 06.12.2014 | PT | 09.12.2014 | IE | 26.04.2015 | LU | 26.04.2015 | CH | 30.04.2015 | LI | 30.04.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 26.04.2012 | |
AT | 06.08.2014 | ||
BE | 06.08.2014 | ||
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
IT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
MC | 06.08.2014 | ||
MK | 06.08.2014 | ||
MT | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
RS | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SI | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
SM | 06.08.2014 | ||
TR | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
IE | 26.04.2015 | ||
LU | 26.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 26.04.2012 | |
AT | 06.08.2014 | ||
BE | 06.08.2014 | ||
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
IT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
MC | 06.08.2014 | ||
MT | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
RS | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SI | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
SM | 06.08.2014 | ||
TR | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
IE | 26.04.2015 | ||
LU | 26.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
BE | 06.08.2014 | ||
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
IT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
MC | 06.08.2014 | ||
MT | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
RS | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SI | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
IE | 26.04.2015 | ||
LU | 26.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/32] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
BE | 06.08.2014 | ||
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
IT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
MC | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
RS | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SI | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
IE | 26.04.2015 | ||
LU | 26.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
IT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
MC | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
RS | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SI | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
IE | 26.04.2015 | ||
LU | 26.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
IT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
MC | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
RS | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SI | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
LU | 26.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/01] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
IT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
MC | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
RS | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SI | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
LU | 26.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/52] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
IT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
RS | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SI | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
LU | 26.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
IT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
RS | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SI | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
IT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
RS | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
IT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
RS | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
HR | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RS | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 06.08.2014 | |
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 06.08.2014 | |
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 06.08.2014 | |
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 06.08.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009094240 (BORDEAUX LUCAS [GB], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2011145336 (CARROLL MARTIN D [US]) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0005] *; | [XI]EP2410477 (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA]) [X] 1-6,9,10,12-15 * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0083]; figures 4-12 * [I] 7,8,11 | by applicant | US2011087747 | US2011231499 |