EP2518706 - Rapid-release device for connecting two units in devices for processing vouchers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.08.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.03.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wincor Nixdorf International GmbH Heinz-Nixdorf-Ring 1 33106 Paderborn / DE | [2012/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Düsterhus, Richard Dirksfeld 45 33106 Paderborn / DE | [2012/44] | Representative(s) | Schaumburg und Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstraße 31 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/36] | Schaumburg und Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 86 07 48 81634 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/44] | Schaumburg, Thoenes, Thurn, Landskron, Eckert Postfach 86 07 48 81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12165957.7 | 27.04.2012 | [2012/44] | Priority number, date | DE20111002304 | 28.04.2011 Original published format: DE102011002304 | [2012/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2518706 | Date: | 31.10.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2518706 | Date: | 06.09.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G07F19/00, G07F9/10, A47B87/00, E05C3/04, F16B21/00 | [2012/44] | CPC: |
G07F19/205 (EP);
E05B65/461 (EP);
G07F9/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/36] |
Former [2012/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Schnellverschlussvorrichtung zum Verbinden zweier Einheiten in Vorrichtungen zur Handhabung von Wertscheinen | [2012/44] | English: | Rapid-release device for connecting two units in devices for processing vouchers | [2012/44] | French: | Dispositif de fermeture rapide pour relier deux unités dans des dispositifs destinés à la manipulation de documents de valeur | [2012/44] | Examination procedure | 30.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/24] | 18.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.07.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.09.2013 | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.04.2012 | AL | 06.09.2017 | CY | 06.09.2017 | CZ | 06.09.2017 | DK | 06.09.2017 | EE | 06.09.2017 | ES | 06.09.2017 | FI | 06.09.2017 | HR | 06.09.2017 | IT | 06.09.2017 | LT | 06.09.2017 | LV | 06.09.2017 | MC | 06.09.2017 | MK | 06.09.2017 | MT | 06.09.2017 | NL | 06.09.2017 | PL | 06.09.2017 | PT | 06.09.2017 | RO | 06.09.2017 | RS | 06.09.2017 | SE | 06.09.2017 | SI | 06.09.2017 | SK | 06.09.2017 | SM | 06.09.2017 | TR | 06.09.2017 | BG | 06.12.2017 | NO | 06.12.2017 | GR | 07.12.2017 | IS | 06.01.2018 | AT | 27.04.2018 | IE | 27.04.2018 | LU | 27.04.2018 | BE | 30.04.2018 | CH | 30.04.2018 | LI | 30.04.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 27.04.2012 | |
CY | 06.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
MK | 06.09.2017 | ||
MT | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PT | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
TR | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
AT | 27.04.2018 | ||
IE | 27.04.2018 | ||
LU | 27.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 27.04.2012 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
MT | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PT | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
TR | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
AT | 27.04.2018 | ||
IE | 27.04.2018 | ||
LU | 27.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | CZ | 06.09.2017 | |
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
MT | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
TR | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
AT | 27.04.2018 | ||
IE | 27.04.2018 | ||
LU | 27.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/46] | CZ | 06.09.2017 | |
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
MT | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
AT | 27.04.2018 | ||
IE | 27.04.2018 | ||
LU | 27.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | CZ | 06.09.2017 | |
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
MT | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
IE | 27.04.2018 | ||
LU | 27.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | CZ | 06.09.2017 | |
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
MT | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
LU | 27.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | CZ | 06.09.2017 | |
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
MT | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
LU | 27.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CZ | 06.09.2017 | |
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
MT | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 06.09.2017 | |
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
MT | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CZ | 06.09.2017 | |
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CZ | 06.09.2017 | |
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | CZ | 06.09.2017 | |
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
SM | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | CZ | 06.09.2017 | |
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
IS | 06.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 06.09.2017 | |
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/15] | ES | 06.09.2017 | |
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | ES | 06.09.2017 | |
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
LV | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | ES | 06.09.2017 | |
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
HR | 06.09.2017 | ||
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
RS | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 06.09.2017 | |
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 06.09.2017 | |
LT | 06.09.2017 | ||
NO | 06.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 06.09.2017 | |
NO | 06.12.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2005052035 (YAMASHITA CHIKARA [JP]) [X] 1,12 * abstract * [I] 1-15; | [A]FR2877980 (THIERACHE AU CREUSET [FR]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]DE202008000285U (BAHADIR TIBBI ALET CIHAZ VE IN [TR]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]GB1038874 (CODE DESIGNS) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]US5182996 (GUTGSELL DAVID R [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]US4844565 (BRAFFORD JAMES M [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]US2009054159 (GADDA CHRISTIAN E [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * | [I] - "DOUBLE LOCKING SNAIL CAM FIXING", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, MASON PUBLICATIONS, HAMPSHIRE, GB, (19960901), no. 389, ISSN 0374-4353, page 534, XP000635458 [I] 1-15 * the whole document * | Examination | DE3808220 | DE3536157 | GB789992 |