EP2660624 - A traffic monitoring device and a method for monitoring a traffic stream. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.10.2014 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.12.2014 [2014/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Traficon International N.V. Vlamingstraat 19 8560 Wevelgem / BE | [2013/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Messely, Pieter c/o Traficon International Vlamingstraat, 19 8560 Wevelgem / BE | 02 /
Favoreel, Wouter c/o Traficon International Vlamingstraat, 19 8560 Wevelgem / BE | [2013/45] | Representative(s) | Quintelier, Claude, et al Gevers & Vander Haeghen Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | [2013/45] | Application number, filing date | 12166237.3 | 30.04.2012 | [2013/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2660624 | Date: | 06.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G01S13/92, G01S13/86, G08G1/017, G08G1/04, G01S7/295, G01S7/40 | [2013/45] | CPC: |
G01S7/2955 (EP,US);
H04N7/183 (US);
G01S13/867 (EP,US);
G01S13/92 (EP,US);
G01S7/4026 (EP,US);
G08G1/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verkehrsüberwachungsvorrichtung und Verfahren zur Überwachung eines Verkehrsstroms | [2013/45] | English: | A traffic monitoring device and a method for monitoring a traffic stream. | [2013/45] | French: | Dispositif de surveillance de trafic et procédé de surveillance d'un flux de trafic | [2013/45] | Examination procedure | 07.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/49] | 03.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/49] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2014 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4866438 (KNISCH KONRAD [DE]) [A] 1,4 * figure 1 ** column 4, line 57 - column 5, line 5 *; | [A]DE19810302 (WIENAND HANS THEO [DE]) [A] 1,4 * figure 1 * * column 4, line 32 - line 50 * * column 5, line 6 - line 20 *; | [Y]US7706978 (SCHIFFMANN JAN K [US], et al) [Y] 1-4 * figures 1-4 * * column 2, line 42 - column 4, line 2 * * column 4, line 55 - column 5, line 23 *; | [Y]US2010246897 (LEHNING MICHAEL [DE]) [Y] 1-4 * figures 2-4 * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0064] * | by applicant | US7541943 |