EP2659908 - Compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.10.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.11.2014 [2014/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Affiris AG Karl-Farkas-Gasse 22 1030 Wien / AT | [2013/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Santic, Radmila Antonigasse 78/15 1180 Vienna / AT | 02 /
Mandler, Markus Dieselgasse 5/115 1100 Vienna / AT | 03 /
Mattner, Frank Cobenzigasse 134 1190 Vienna / AT | 04 /
Schmidt, Walter Böcklinstraße 19 1020 Vienna / AT | [2013/45] | Representative(s) | SONN Patentanwälte GmbH & Co KG Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2013/45] | Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 12166316.5 | 01.05.2012 | [2013/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2659908 | Date: | 06.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/00 | [2013/45] | CPC: |
A61K39/0007 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61K2039/55505 (EP);
A61K2039/55555 (EP);
A61K2039/55566 (EP);
A61K2039/55577 (EP);
A61K2039/6037 (EP);
A61K2039/6081 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Zusammensetzungen | [2013/45] | English: | Compositions | [2013/45] | French: | Compositions | [2013/45] | Examination procedure | 07.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/47] | 13.06.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/47] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2014 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2006005707 (MATTNER FRANK [AT], et al) [X] 1-8,16 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2009149487 (AFFIRIS AG [AT], et al) [X] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2009149486 (AFFIRIS AG [AT], et al) [X] 1-16 * the whole document * | [A] - SCHNEEBERGER A ET AL, "Development of Alzheimer AFFITOPE vaccines - from concept to clinical testing", ALZHEIMER'S & DEMENTIA: THE JOURNAL OF THE ALZHEIMER'SASSOCIATION, ELSEVIER, NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 5, no. 4, doi:10.1016/J.JALZ.2009.04.281, ISSN 1552-5260, (20090701), page P257, (20090701), XP026898143 [A] 1-16 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jalz.2009.04.281 | by applicant | US2007213253 | WO2004041067 | US2003166558 | US2005198694 | US2005037013 | WO2006045037 | US4666886 | WO2009118296 | WO2008005555 | WO2009111337 | WO2009067081 | WO2007040840 | WO2010014913 | WO9003184 | WO9611711 | WO0048630 | WO9836772 | WO2006134423 | WO2007026190 | WO9944636 | GB2220221 | EP0689454 | EP0835318 | EP0735898 | EP0761231 | WO9952549 | WO0121207 | WO0121152 | WO9911241 | WO9857659 | WO2006005707 | WO2009149485 | WO2009149486 | WO2009149487 | - IWATSUBO T., NEUROPATHOLOGY, (2007), vol. 27, no. 5, pages 474 - 478 | - LIANG ET AL., J. NEUROCHEM., (2006), vol. 99, pages 470 - 482 | - GENOMICS, (2004), vol. 83, pages 739 - 742 | - CARLOS F. BARBAS, Display: A Laboratory Manual, UNKNOWN | - WILLATS WG, "Phage display: practicalities and prospects.", PLANT MOL. BIOL., (200212), vol. 50, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1023/A:1021215516430, pages 837 - 54, XP003011839 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1021215516430 | - UCHIDA ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1973), vol. 218, pages 3838 - 3844 | - SINGH ET AL., NAT. BIOTECH., (1999), vol. 17, pages 1075 - 1081 | - O'HAGAN ET AL., NATURE REVIEWS, DRUG DISCOVERY, (2003), vol. 2, no. 9, pages 727 - 735 | - SJOLANDER ET AL., J. LEUKOCYTE BIOL., (1998), vol. 64, page 713 | - REED SG, TREND IMMUNOL, (2008), vol. 30, pages 23 - 32 | - REZAIE, P. ET AL., DEV. BRAIN RES., (1999), vol. 115, pages 71 - 81 | - MILDNER ET AL., NAT NEUROSCI., (200712), vol. 10, no. 12, pages 1544 - 53 | - LEBSON L ET AL., J NEUROSCI., (20100721), vol. 30, no. 29, pages 9651 - 8 |