EP2537677 - Sheet observation system for rotary printing press [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 17.03.2017 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BST eltromat International GmbH Heidsieker Heide 53 33739 Bielefeld / DE | [2016/51] |
Former [2012/52] | For all designated states eltromat GmbH Herforder Strasse 249-251 33818 Leopoldshöhe / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schönfeld, Volker Theo-Reckmeyer-Str. 12 33332 Gütersloh / DE | 02 /
Völlmecke, Dirk Kiefernweg 45 33415 Verl / DE | [2012/52] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/20] | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | ||
Former [2012/52] | TER MEER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 12166640.8 | 03.05.2012 | [2012/52] | Priority number, date | DE20112050535U | 22.06.2011 Original published format: DE 202011050535 U | [2012/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2537677 | Date: | 26.12.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2537677 | Date: | 16.04.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B41F33/00, B41F33/14, G06K9/32 | [2012/52] | CPC: |
B41F33/14 (EP);
B41F33/0036 (EP);
H04N1/6047 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/52] | Title | German: | Bahnbeobachtungssystem für Rotationsdruckmaschinen | [2012/52] | English: | Sheet observation system for rotary printing press | [2012/52] | French: | Système d'observation de bande pour des presses rotatives | [2012/52] | Examination procedure | 19.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/31] | 02.08.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 29.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.11.2013 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
15.01.2015
22.01.2015
ADMISSIBLE manroland web systems GmbH Alois-Senefelder-Allee 1 86153 Augsburg / DE | [2015/09] | 20.02.2015 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 22.06.2015 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 16.11.2016 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2017/16] | 16.11.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.11.2016 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 28.11.2016 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 29.08.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 29.08.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.09.2013 | Decision despatched |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.05.2012 | AL | 16.04.2014 | CY | 16.04.2014 | CZ | 16.04.2014 | DK | 16.04.2014 | EE | 16.04.2014 | FI | 16.04.2014 | HR | 16.04.2014 | LT | 16.04.2014 | LV | 16.04.2014 | MC | 16.04.2014 | MK | 16.04.2014 | MT | 16.04.2014 | NL | 16.04.2014 | PL | 16.04.2014 | RO | 16.04.2014 | RS | 16.04.2014 | SE | 16.04.2014 | SI | 16.04.2014 | SK | 16.04.2014 | SM | 16.04.2014 | TR | 16.04.2014 | IE | 03.05.2014 | LU | 03.05.2014 | BE | 31.05.2014 | BG | 16.07.2014 | NO | 16.07.2014 | GR | 17.07.2014 | IS | 16.08.2014 | PT | 18.08.2014 | CH | 31.05.2015 | LI | 31.05.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 03.05.2012 | |
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
MC | 16.04.2014 | ||
MK | 16.04.2014 | ||
MT | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
RS | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SI | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
SM | 16.04.2014 | ||
TR | 16.04.2014 | ||
IE | 03.05.2014 | ||
LU | 03.05.2014 | ||
BE | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 03.05.2012 | |
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
MC | 16.04.2014 | ||
MT | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
RS | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SI | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
SM | 16.04.2014 | ||
TR | 16.04.2014 | ||
IE | 03.05.2014 | ||
LU | 03.05.2014 | ||
BE | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 03.05.2012 | |
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
MC | 16.04.2014 | ||
MT | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
RS | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SI | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
SM | 16.04.2014 | ||
IE | 03.05.2014 | ||
BE | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
MC | 16.04.2014 | ||
MT | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
RS | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SI | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
SM | 16.04.2014 | ||
IE | 03.05.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
MC | 16.04.2014 | ||
MT | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RS | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SI | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
SM | 16.04.2014 | ||
IE | 03.05.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/16] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
MC | 16.04.2014 | ||
MT | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RS | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SI | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
IE | 03.05.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
MC | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RS | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SI | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
IE | 03.05.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
MC | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RS | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SI | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
IE | 03.05.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
MC | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RS | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
IE | 03.05.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
MC | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RS | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
MC | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RS | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
DK | 16.04.2014 | ||
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RS | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RS | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/52] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RS | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
SE | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
FI | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 16.04.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2008297861 (NOFFKE PATRICK JAMES [US]) [Y] 1-11 * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0050]; figure 3 *; | [Y]EP0860276 (BALDWIN GRAFOTEC GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-11 * column 3, line 23 - line 27 *; | [Y]JP2006082501 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [Y] 1 * abstract * |