EP2663094 - Methods and apparatus for processing audio signals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.2015 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oticon A/S Kongebakken 9 2765 Smørum / DK | [2013/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pontoppidan, Niels Henrik Oticon A/S c/o Kongebakken 9 DK-2765 Smørum / DK | 02 /
Lunner, Thomas Oticon A/S c/o Kongebakken 9 DK-2765 Smørum / DK | 03 /
Vatti, Marianna Oticon A/S c/o Kongebakken 9 DK-2765 Smørum / DK | [2013/46] | Application number, filing date | 12167267.9 | 09.05.2012 | [2013/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2663094 | Date: | 13.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2663094 | Date: | 24.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04R25/00, // G10L21/02 | [2014/31] | CPC: |
H04R25/353 (EP,US);
H03G3/00 (US);
G10L21/0364 (EP,US);
H03C1/00 (US);
H03C3/40 (US);
H03C5/00 (US);
|
Former IPC [2013/46] | H04R25/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/46] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Verarbeitung von Audiosignalen | [2013/46] | English: | Methods and apparatus for processing audio signals | [2013/46] | French: | Procédés et appareil de traitement de signaux audio | [2013/46] | Examination procedure | 12.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/26] | 21.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.11.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP14199546.4 / EP2890159 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | 25.09.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.05.2012 | AL | 24.12.2014 | AT | 24.12.2014 | BE | 24.12.2014 | BG | 24.12.2014 | CY | 24.12.2014 | CZ | 24.12.2014 | EE | 24.12.2014 | ES | 24.12.2014 | FI | 24.12.2014 | HR | 24.12.2014 | IT | 24.12.2014 | LT | 24.12.2014 | LV | 24.12.2014 | MC | 24.12.2014 | MK | 24.12.2014 | MT | 24.12.2014 | NL | 24.12.2014 | PL | 24.12.2014 | PT | 24.12.2014 | RO | 24.12.2014 | RS | 24.12.2014 | SE | 24.12.2014 | SI | 24.12.2014 | SK | 24.12.2014 | SM | 24.12.2014 | TR | 24.12.2014 | NO | 24.03.2015 | GR | 25.03.2015 | IS | 24.04.2015 | IE | 09.05.2015 | LU | 09.05.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/37] | HU | 09.05.2012 | |
AT | 24.12.2014 | ||
BE | 24.12.2014 | ||
BG | 24.12.2014 | ||
CY | 24.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
IT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
MC | 24.12.2014 | ||
MK | 24.12.2014 | ||
MT | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PT | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
RS | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SI | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
SM | 24.12.2014 | ||
TR | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IS | 24.04.2015 | ||
IE | 09.05.2015 | ||
LU | 09.05.2015 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 09.05.2012 | |
AT | 24.12.2014 | ||
BE | 24.12.2014 | ||
BG | 24.12.2014 | ||
CY | 24.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
IT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
MC | 24.12.2014 | ||
MK | 24.12.2014 | ||
MT | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
RS | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SI | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
SM | 24.12.2014 | ||
TR | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IS | 24.04.2015 | ||
IE | 09.05.2015 | ||
LU | 09.05.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 09.05.2012 | |
AT | 24.12.2014 | ||
BE | 24.12.2014 | ||
BG | 24.12.2014 | ||
CY | 24.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
IT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
MC | 24.12.2014 | ||
MT | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
RS | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SI | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
SM | 24.12.2014 | ||
TR | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IS | 24.04.2015 | ||
IE | 09.05.2015 | ||
LU | 09.05.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 24.12.2014 | |
BE | 24.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
IT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
MC | 24.12.2014 | ||
MT | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
RS | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SI | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IS | 24.04.2015 | ||
IE | 09.05.2015 | ||
LU | 09.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 24.12.2014 | |
BE | 24.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
IT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
MC | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
RS | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SI | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IS | 24.04.2015 | ||
IE | 09.05.2015 | ||
LU | 09.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 24.12.2014 | |
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
IT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
MC | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
RS | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SI | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IS | 24.04.2015 | ||
IE | 09.05.2015 | ||
LU | 09.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 24.12.2014 | |
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
IT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
MC | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
RS | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SI | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IS | 24.04.2015 | ||
LU | 09.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | AT | 24.12.2014 | |
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
IT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
MC | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
RS | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IS | 24.04.2015 | ||
LU | 09.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 24.12.2014 | |
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
IT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
RS | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IS | 24.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 24.12.2014 | |
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
RS | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IS | 24.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CZ | 24.12.2014 | |
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
RS | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CZ | 24.12.2014 | |
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
RS | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | EE | 24.12.2014 | |
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RS | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 24.12.2014 | |
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RS | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/29] | FI | 24.12.2014 | |
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RS | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | FI | 24.12.2014 | |
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
RS | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | FI | 24.12.2014 | |
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 24.12.2014 | |
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 24.12.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US2003044034 (ZENG FAN-GANG [US], et al) [AD] 1-15 * paragraphs [0024] - [0025] * * figures 1-2 *; | [AD]EP2184929 (OTICON AS [DK]) [AD] 1-15* paragraphs [0008] , [0012] - [0018] - [0021] *; | [AD] - LAZZARINI VICTOR ET AL, "Theory and Practice of Modified Frequency Modulation Synthesis", JAES, AES, 60 EAST 42ND STREET, ROOM 2520 NEW YORK 10165-2520, USA, (20100601), vol. 58, no. 6, pages 459 - 471, XP040567054 [AD] 15 * page 463; section 2 * * page 463; figure 5 * * pages 467-468; section 4 * * page 469; figure 16 * | [AD] - JOHN M CHOWNING, "The Synthesis of Complex Audio Spectra by Means of Frequency Modulation", JOURNAL OF THE AUDIO ENGINEERING SOCIETY,, (19730901), vol. 21, no. 7, pages 526 - 534, XP001398569 [AD] 1-15 * figures 10, 16 * | [AD] - POTAMIANOS A ET AL, "Speech analysis and synthesis using an AM-FM modulation model", SPEECH COMMUNICATION, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19990701), vol. 28, no. 3, doi:10.1016/S0167-6393(99)00012-6, ISSN 0167-6393, pages 195 - 209, XP004172904 [AD] 1-15 * section 3; pages 202-205 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0167-6393(99)00012-6 | [AD] - MARAGOS P ET AL, "ENERGY SEPARATION IN SIGNAL MODULATIONS WITH APPLICATION TO SPEECH ANALYSIS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SIGNAL PROCESSING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19931001), vol. 41, no. 10, doi:10.1109/78.277799, ISSN 1053-587X, pages 3024 - 3051, XP000404067 [AD] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/78.277799 | by applicant | WO9103042 | WO2006032917 | US7225027 | EP2026601 | EP2091266 | EP2184929 | - BOVIK AC.; MARAGOS P.; QUATIERI TF., "AM-FM Energy Detection and Spearation in Noise using Multiband Energy Operators", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SIGNAL PROCESSING, (1993), vol. 41, no. 12, doi:doi:10.1109/78.258071, pages 3245 - 3265, XP000426645 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/78.258071 | - CHOWNING J., "The synthesis of complex audio spectra by means of frequency modulation", JOURNAL OF THE AUDIO ENGINEERING SOCIETY, (1973), vol. 21, no. 7, pages 526 - 534, XP001398569 | - DE CHEVEIGNE A.; KAWAHARA H., "YIN, a fundamental frequency estimator for speech and music", THE JOURNAL OF THE ACOUSTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, (2002), vol. 111, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1121/1.1458024, pages 1917 - 1030, XP012002854 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1121/1.1458024 | - HEINZ MG.; SWAMINATHAN J.; BOLEY JD.; KALE S., "Across-fiber coding of temporal fine-structure: Effects of noise-induced hearing loss on auditory-nerve responses", THE NEUROPHYSIOLOGICAL BASES OF AUDITORY PERCEPTION, (2010), pages 621 - 630 | - HOPKINS K.; MOORE BCJ, "The effects of age and cochlear hearing loss on temporal fine structure sensitivity, frequency selectivity and speech reception in noise", THE JOURNAL OF THE ACOUSTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, (2011), vol. 130, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1121/1.3585848, pages 334 - 349, XP012136668 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1121/1.3585848 | - HOPKINS K.; MOORE BCJ, "Moderate cochlear hearing loss leads to a reduced ability to use temporal fine structure information", J. ACOUST. SOC. AM., (2007), vol. 122, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1121/1.2749457, pages 1055 - 1068, XP012102363 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1121/1.2749457 | - HOPKINS K.; MOORE BCJ; STONE MA., "Effects of moderate cochlear hearing loss on the ability to benefit from temporal fine structure information in speech", JOURNAL OF THE ACOUSTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, (2008), vol. 123, no. 2, pages 1140 - 1153 | - KUBO Y.; OKAWA S.; KUREMATSU A.; SHIRAI K., "Temporal AM-FM combination for robust speech recognition", SPEECH COMMUNICATION, (2011), vol. 53, no. 5, pages 716 - 725 | - LAZZARINI V.; TIMONEY J., "Theory and Practice of Modified Frequency Modulation Synthesis", JOURNAL OF THE AUDIO ENGINEERING SOCIETY, (2010), vol. 58, no. 6, pages 459 - 471, XP040567054 | - LINDBLOM B., "Role of articulation in speech perception: Clues from production", JOURNAL OF THE ACOUSTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, (1996), vol. 99, no. 3, pages 1683 - 1692 | - MARAGOS P.; KAISER JF.; QUATIERI TF., "Energy separation in signal modulations with application to speech analysis", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SIGNAL PROCESSING, (1993), vol. 41, no. 10, doi:doi:10.1109/78.277799, pages 3024 - 3051, XP000404067 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/78.277799 | - MARAGOS P.; KAISER JF.; QUATIERI TF., "On Amplitude and Frequency Demodulation Using Energy Operators", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SIGNAL PROCESSING, (1993), vol. 41, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1109/78.212729, pages 1532 - 1550, XP002422867 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/78.212729 | - MICHEYL C.; KEEBLER MV.; OXENHAM AJ., "Pitch perception for mixtures of spectrally overlapping harmonic complex tones", JOURNAL OF THE ACOUSTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, (2010), vol. 128, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1121/1.3372751, pages 257 - 269, XP012135856 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1121/1.3372751 | - MOORE BCJ.; SEK A., "Development of a fast method for determining sensitivity to temporal fine structure", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF AUDIOLOGY, (2009), vol. 48, no. 4, pages 161 - 171 | - MOORE BCJ.; GLASBERG BR., "A revised model of loudness perception applied to cochlear hearing loss", HEARING RESEARCH, (2004), vol. 188, pages 70 - 88 | - MOORE BCJ.; SKRODZKA E., "Detection of frequency modulation by hearing-impaired listeners: Effects of carrier frequency, modulation rate and added amplitude modulation", THE JOURNAL OF THE ACOUSTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, (2002), vol. 111, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1121/1.1424871, pages 327 - 335, XP012002683 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1121/1.1424871 | - NIE K.; STICKNEY G.; ZENG F-G., "Encoding Frequency Modulation to Improve Cochlear Implant Performance in Noise", IEEE TRANSACTION ON BIOMEDICAL ENGINEERING, (2005), vol. 52, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1109/TBME.2004.839799, pages 64 - 73, XP011123747 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TBME.2004.839799 | - POTAMIANOS A.; MARAGOS P., "Speech analysis and synthesis using an AM-FM modulation model", SPEECH COMMUNICATION, (1999), vol. 28, doi:doi:10.1016/S0167-6393(99)00012-6, pages 195 - 209, XP004172904 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0167-6393(99)00012-6 | - RUGGLES D.; BHARADWAJ H.; SHINN-CUNNINGHAM BG, "Normal hearing is not enough to guarantee robust encoding of suprathreshold features important in everyday communication", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U. S. A, (2011), vol. 108, no. 37, pages 15516 - 15521 | - TEAGER HM., "Some Observations on Oral Air Flow During Phonation", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, (1980), vol. 28, no. 5, pages 599 - 601 | - "Evidence for nonlinear sound production mechanisms in the vocal tract", TEAGER HM.; TEAGER SM., Speech production and speech modelling, KLUWER, (1990), pages 241 - 261 | - WANG Y.; KUMARESAN R., "Real Time Decomposition of Speech into Modulated Components", JOURNAL OF THE ACOUSTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, (2006), vol. 119, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1121/1.2198567, pages EL68 - EL73, XP012085434 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1121/1.2198567 | - ZENG FG.; NIE K.; STICKNEY GS.; KONG YY.; VONGPHOE M.; BHARGAVE A.; WEI C.; CAO K., "Speech recognition with amplitude and frequency modulations", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, (2005), vol. 102, no. 7, pages 2293 - 2298 | - ZHOU G.; HANSEN JHL.; KAISER JF., "Nonlinear Feature Based Classification of Speech Under Stress", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SPEECH AND AUDIO PROCESSING, (2001), vol. 9, no. 3, pages 201 - 216, XP011054093 |