EP2662555 - Method for monitoring an injection valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.11.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.12.2014 [2014/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | [2013/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grandi, Mauro Viale Città del Vaticano N[deg]44 57128 Livorno / IT | [2013/46] | Application number, filing date | 12167414.7 | 10.05.2012 | [2013/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2662555 | Date: | 13.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/22, F02D41/24 | [2013/46] | CPC: |
F02D41/221 (EP,US);
F02M51/061 (US);
F02D41/2467 (EP,US);
F02M57/005 (US);
F02D2041/2034 (EP,US);
F02D2041/2044 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Überwachung eines Einspritzventils | [2013/46] | English: | Method for monitoring an injection valve | [2013/46] | French: | Procédé de surveillance d'une soupape d'injection | [2013/46] | Examination procedure | 14.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/51] | 02.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/51] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2014 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE4122348 (JATCO CORP [JP]) [X] 1 * column 1, line 25 - line 42 * * column 2, line 26 - line 55 * * figures 2,3 *; | [X]WO9413991 (PI RESEARCH LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-4 * page 1, line 1 - line 15 * * page 2, line 27 - line 35 * * page 3, line 23 - page 4, line 11 * * page 8, line 8 - page 9, line 25 * * figures 4a-4c * * figure 13 *; | [XI]US2008148831 (KEKEDJIAN HARRY [CA], et al) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0038] * * figures 3a-d * * figures 6a,6b * * figures 4,5 * [I] 3,4; | [A]DE102009045307 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-4 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0005] , [0012] ** figure 3 * |