EP2487153 - Substituted cyclopentanes having prostaglandin activity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.07.2015 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALLERGAN, INC. 2525 Dupont Drive Irvine, CA 92612 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2012/33] | For all designated states Allergan, Inc. 2525 Dupont Drive Irvine, CA 92612 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Burk, Robert M. 1337 Cerritos Drive Laguna Beach, CA 92651 / US | [2014/26] |
Former [2012/33] | 01 /
Burk, Robert M. 1337 Cerritos Drive Laguna Beach, CA California 92651 / US | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/33] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12167472.5 | 03.02.2009 | [2012/33] | Priority number, date | US20080026179P | 05.02.2008 Original published format: US 26179 P | US20090363996 | 02.02.2009 Original published format: US 363996 | [2012/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2487153 | Date: | 15.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C07C405/00, A61K31/192, A61K31/047, A61P27/06, A61P27/02 | [2012/33] | CPC: |
C07C405/00 (EP,US);
A61P17/14 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/06 (EP);
C07C405/0008 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/33] | Title | German: | Substituierte Cyclopentane mit Prostaglandinwirkung | [2012/33] | English: | Substituted cyclopentanes having prostaglandin activity | [2012/33] | French: | Cyclopentanes substitués ayant une activité de prostaglandine | [2012/33] | Examination procedure | 10.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/33] | 15.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 03.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/35] | 27.03.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2015/35] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09708693.8 / EP2245005 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20090708693) is 14.10.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2015 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0116358 (BAYER AG [DE]) [Y] 1-4 * see page 13, compound V *; | [Y]WO9833497 (JOHNSTONE MURRAY A [US]) [Y] 1-4 * compounds of table 1 * * page 10, line 31 - page 11, line 3 *; | [Y]WO0174313 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [Y] 1-4 * abstract * * compounds in the table on page 37 *; | [Y]WO2005013928 (SUCAMPO AG [CH], et al) [Y] 1-4 * compound 15 on page 28 ** claims 1-13 *; | [Y]US2005070516 (WILSON LELAND F [US], et al) [Y] 1-4 * claim 43 *; | [YD]WO2006063179 (ALLERGAN INC [US], et al) [YD] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2007060453 (MEDICAL RES COUNCIL [GB], et al) [Y] 1-4 * claim 2 * | by applicant | US7091231 | - "Prodrugs and Drug Delivery Systems", RICHARD B. SILVERMAN, Organic Chemistry of Drug Design and Drug Action, ELSEVIER ACADEMIC PRESS, (2004), pages 496 - 557 | US20060553143 |