EP2525015 - Assembly comprising a railing and a baseboard [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.04.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.05.2016 [2016/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DANI ALU Lieudit Clape Loup 69280 Sainte Consorce / FR | [2012/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Laffay, Serge 3 allée de la Pie verte 69340 Francheville / FR | 02 /
Duplat, Bruno 11 ch des Aubépines 69340 Francheville / FR | 03 /
Rulliere, Patrice 17 route de la Plaine 42800 Saint Martin la Plaine / FR | 04 /
Peyron, Grégory 139 rue du Pont Chabrol 69126 Brindas / FR | 05 /
Canivet, Damien 18 avenue de la Constellation 69160 Tassin le Demi Lune / FR | 06 /
Kula, Cédric 20 rue Calliet 69001 Lyon / FR | 07 /
Blain, David 11 avenue du Maréchal Joffre 69630 Chaponost / FR | [2013/13] |
Former [2012/47] | 01 /
Laffay, Serge 3 allée de la Pie verte 69340 Francheville / FR | ||
02 /
Duplat, Bruno 11 ch des Aubépines 69340 Francheville / FR | |||
03 /
Rulliere, Patrice 17 route de la Plaine 42800 Saint Martin la Plaine / FR | |||
04 /
Peyron, Grégory 139 rue du Pont Chabrol 69126 Brindas / FR | |||
05 /
Canivet, Damien 10 avenue de la Constellation 69160 Tassin / FR | |||
06 /
Kula, Cédric 20 rue Calliet 69001 Lyon / FR | |||
07 /
Blain, David 11 avenue du Maréchal Joffre 69630 Chaponost / FR | Representative(s) | Chevalier, Renaud Philippe, et al Cabinet Germain & Maureau BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/47] | Chevalier, Renaud Philippe, et al Cabinet Germain & Maureau BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | Application number, filing date | 12167918.7 | 14.05.2012 | [2012/47] | Priority number, date | FR20110054290 | 17.05.2011 Original published format: FR 1154290 | [2012/47] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2525015 | Date: | 21.11.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | E04F11/18, E04G21/32 | [2012/47] | CPC: |
E04F11/1804 (EP);
E04F11/1812 (EP);
E04G21/3223 (EP);
E04G7/28 (EP);
E04G2007/285 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Anordnung mit einem Geländer und einer Sockelleiste | [2012/47] | English: | Assembly comprising a railing and a baseboard | [2012/47] | French: | Assemblage comprenant un garde-corps et une plinthe | [2012/47] | Examination procedure | 11.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/16] | 01.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/19] | 08.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2015 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2009004149 (DANI ALU [FR], et al) [A] 1,12 * page 12, paragraph 4; figures 7,11 *; | [AD]GB2388151 (EUROGRID LTD [GB]) [AD] 1 * page 1, paragraph 1; figure - * * page 5, paragraph 4 *; | [AD]US3851858 (KOMISKE F) [AD] 1 * column 3, line 26 - column 4, line 43; figures 1-5 *; | [A]FR2939461 (LR ETANCO ATEL [FR]) [A] 1 * page 9, line 12 - page 10, line 1; figure 8 * | by applicant | US3851858 | GB2388151 |