EP2530071 - Fused polycyclic compound and organic light-emitting device using the compound [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.2014 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2012/49] | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ohrui, Hiroki c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | 02 /
Iwawaki, Hironobu c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | 03 /
Tagami, Kei c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | 04 /
Muratsubaki, Masanori c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | 05 /
Ishii, Ryuji c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2012/49] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2012/49] | Application number, filing date | 12168005.2 | 15.05.2012 | [2012/49] | Priority number, date | JP20110120164 | 30.05.2011 Original published format: JP 2011120164 | [2012/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2530071 | Date: | 05.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2530071 | Date: | 04.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C07C255/50, C07C255/51, C07D235/18, C07D498/04, C09K11/06, H01L51/00, H05B33/14, H01L51/50 | [2013/26] | CPC: |
C07C255/50 (EP,US);
H10K85/615 (KR);
C07C255/10 (KR);
C07C255/51 (EP,US);
C07C309/36 (KR);
C07D235/18 (EP,US);
C07D498/04 (EP,US);
C09K11/06 (EP,US);
C09K19/3469 (KR);
H05B33/14 (EP,US);
H10K50/12 (KR);
H10K59/122 (KR);
H10K85/624 (EP,US);
C07C2603/54 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1011 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1029 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1033 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1044 (EP,US);
H10K50/11 (EP,US);
H10K85/622 (EP,US);
H10K85/626 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/49] | C07C255/50, C07C255/51, C07D235/18, C07D498/04, C09K11/06, H01L51/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/49] | Title | German: | Kondensierte polyzyklische Verbindung und diese Verbindung verwendende organische lichtemittierende Vorrichtung | [2012/49] | English: | Fused polycyclic compound and organic light-emitting device using the compound | [2012/49] | French: | Composé polycyclique fusionné et dispositif électroluminescent organique utilisant le composé | [2012/49] | Examination procedure | 11.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/12] | 21.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.06.2013 | Opposition(s) | 05.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/46] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.05.2012 | AL | 04.12.2013 | AT | 04.12.2013 | BE | 04.12.2013 | BG | 04.12.2013 | CY | 04.12.2013 | CZ | 04.12.2013 | DK | 04.12.2013 | EE | 04.12.2013 | ES | 04.12.2013 | FI | 04.12.2013 | HR | 04.12.2013 | IT | 04.12.2013 | LT | 04.12.2013 | LV | 04.12.2013 | MC | 04.12.2013 | MK | 04.12.2013 | MT | 04.12.2013 | NL | 04.12.2013 | PL | 04.12.2013 | RO | 04.12.2013 | RS | 04.12.2013 | SE | 04.12.2013 | SI | 04.12.2013 | SK | 04.12.2013 | SM | 04.12.2013 | TR | 04.12.2013 | NO | 04.03.2014 | GR | 05.03.2014 | IS | 04.04.2014 | PT | 04.04.2014 | IE | 15.05.2014 | LU | 15.05.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 15.05.2012 | |
AT | 04.12.2013 | ||
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
BG | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
IT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
MK | 04.12.2013 | ||
MT | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
RS | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
SM | 04.12.2013 | ||
TR | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
GR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
IE | 15.05.2014 | ||
LU | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 15.05.2012 | |
AT | 04.12.2013 | ||
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
BG | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
IT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
MT | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
RS | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
SM | 04.12.2013 | ||
TR | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
GR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
IE | 15.05.2014 | ||
LU | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 15.05.2012 | |
AT | 04.12.2013 | ||
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
BG | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
IT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
MT | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
RS | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
SM | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
GR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
IE | 15.05.2014 | ||
LU | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
BG | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
IT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
MT | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
RS | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
SM | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
GR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
IE | 15.05.2014 | ||
LU | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
IT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
MT | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
RS | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
SM | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
GR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
IE | 15.05.2014 | ||
LU | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
IT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
MT | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
RS | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
SM | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
IE | 15.05.2014 | ||
LU | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
IT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
MT | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
RS | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
IE | 15.05.2014 | ||
LU | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
IT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
RS | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
IE | 15.05.2014 | ||
LU | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
RS | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
IE | 15.05.2014 | ||
LU | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
RS | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
LU | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
RS | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
LU | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/04] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
RS | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
LU | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
RS | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
RS | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RS | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RS | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RS | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RS | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RS | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 04.12.2013 | |
HR | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 04.12.2013 | |
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
NO | 04.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 04.12.2013 | |
NO | 04.03.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2085371 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO [JP]); | [AD]EP2243761 (CANON KK [JP]); | [AD]WO2010123153 (CANON KK [JP], et al); | [A]EP2314558 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO [JP]) | by applicant | JP2010254610 | JP2010270103 |