EP2664663 - Method for making a fuel additive [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.02.2023 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.03.2023 [2023/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SSL Energizer Technologies AG Rütistrasse 20 9050 Appenzell / CH | [2013/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Foerg, Wolfgang c/o SSL Energizer Technologies AG Rütistraße 20 9050 Appenzell / CH | 02 /
Radig, Wolfram, Dr. Spitzigerfeldstrasse 10 9437 Marbach SG / CH | [2013/47] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2014/33] |
Former [2013/47] | Witte, Weller & Partner Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 12168102.7 | 15.05.2012 | [2013/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2664663 | Date: | 20.11.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C10L1/10, C10L1/14, C10L10/00, C10L10/02, C10G25/00, C10G25/12, C10G53/08, C10G53/14, C07B41/00 | [2013/47] | CPC: |
C10G25/003 (EP);
C10G25/12 (EP);
C10G27/00 (EP);
C10G53/08 (EP);
C10G53/14 (EP);
C10L1/10 (EP);
C10L1/14 (EP);
C10L1/1817 (EP);
C10L10/00 (EP);
C10L10/02 (EP);
C10L1/1233 (EP);
C10L1/1266 (EP);
C10L1/1275 (EP);
C10L1/1291 (EP);
C10L1/1616 (EP);
C10L1/1805 (EP);
C10L1/1824 (EP);
C10L1/1852 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Treibstoffadditivs | [2013/47] | English: | Method for making a fuel additive | [2013/47] | French: | Procédé destiné à la fabrication d'un additif de carburant | [2013/47] | Examination procedure | 11.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/47] | 01.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.03.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/12] | 26.10.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/12] | Public notification(s) | Feststellung eines Rechtsverlusts nach Regel 112(1) EPÜ (EPA Form 2524 vom 21/07/2022) | SSL Energizer Technologies AG Rütistrasse 20 9050 Appenzell / CH | [2022/43] | Mitteilung gemäß Regel 142 EPÜ (Wiederaufnahme des Verfahrens nach Regel 142 (2) EPÜ vom 12.03.2021) | SSL Energizer Technologies AG Rütistrasse 20 9050 Appenzell / CH | [2021/18] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.11.2013 | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.09.2021 | 03   M06   Not yet paid | 01.09.2021 | 04   M06   Not yet paid | 01.09.2021 | 05   M06   Not yet paid | 01.09.2021 | 06   M06   Not yet paid | 01.09.2021 | 07   M06   Not yet paid | 01.09.2021 | 08   M06   Not yet paid | 01.09.2021 | 09   M06   Not yet paid | 01.09.2021 | 10   M06   Not yet paid | 31.05.2022 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 20.03.2014 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2014/25] | 01.09.2021 | Resumption of proceedings | [2021/09] | 20.03.2014 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2021/09] | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2006093877 (UNIV MICHIGAN STATE [US], et al) [X] 1-3,8,9,11,12,14-22 * paragraphs [0004] , [0006] , [0007] , [0017] , [0024] , [0027] , [0029] , [0031] , [0033] , [0035] , [0036]; examples 1,3; claims 1-4,6,7,9-11 * [I] 4-6; | [X]WO2011126653 (TRANSONIC COMB INC [US], et al) [X] 1,7,11,16-22 * page 1 - page 4; figures 1-5; claims 1-25 *; | [XI]WO2009077606 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL], et al) [X] 1,11-19,22 * page 3, line 2 - line 5; examples 1-3; claims 1-4,6 * * page 3, line 3 - line 25 * * page 4, line 16 - line 26 * * page 5, line 1 - page 6, line 21 * * page 7, line 1 - line 18 * [I] 20,21; | [XI]WO2009064828 (DU PONT [US], et al) [X] 1,7-9,11,12,14-19,22 * page 6, line 18 - page 7, line 2; examples 1-4; claims 1-5,7-9,11,12,15-20,22,23,26-33,35,36; table 1 * * page 9, line 12 - page 10, line 25 * * page 12, line 1 - line 10 * * page 15, line 22 - line 30 * [I] 4-6,10,13; | [X]WO2012016250 (DUONG VAN DUNG [VN]) [X] 1,7,12,16-22 * page 10, paragraph 4 - page 12, paragraph 1; figure 2; claims 1-14 * * page 15, line 1 - line 8 * * page 16 *; | [XI]DE1272293 (NAGYNYOMASU KISERLETI INTEZET) [X] 1,7-9,12-16 * column 1, line 17 - line 36; figures 1-3; examples 1,3; claim 1 * * column 4, line 14 - line 36 * [I] 10,11; | [X]US3732326 (CHEN N) [X] 1,11,12,16 * examples 3-5; claims 1,3-10; tables 1-3 *; | [XY]WO8201889 (ADRIEL ENERGY CORP [US]) [X] 16-22 * page 1, line 3 - line 19; claims 1-8,11,12,15; table I * * page 2, line 33 - page 3, line 16 * * page 4, line 7 - line 14 * * page 4, line 27 - page 5, line 34 * [Y] 23; | [Y]US2005028436 (GANTZER CHARLES J [US]) [Y] 23 * paragraphs [0002] , [0017] , [0023] - [0025] - [0051] , [0052]; figures 1-3; claims 1,2,13-24 *; | [XD]EP0478828 (NASU ATSUSHI [JP]) [XD] 16-22 * page 2, line 39 - line 41; examples 1-5; claims 1-4,6; tables 1-4 * * page 4, line 39 - page 6, line 4 * | [X] - FRANCESCO ANCILLOTTI ET AL, "Oxygenate fuels: Market expansion and catalytic aspect of synthesis", FUEL PROCESSING TECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER BV, NL, vol. 57, no. 3, doi:10.1016/S0378-3820(98)00081-2, ISSN 0378-3820, (19981001), pages 163 - 194, (19981201), XP007908551 [X] 1,7,11-22 * page 165, paragraph 4; figures 1,2; tables 2,3,6 * * page 167, paragraph 2 * * page 178, paragraph 5 - paragraph 7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-3820(98)00081-2 | by applicant | WO2005054314 | EP0626994 | EP0478828 |