EP2664297 - Connection set, male component and female component for reversible fixing of a dental prosthetic [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.10.2014 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.11.2014 [2014/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cendres + Métaux SA Bözingenstrasse 122 2504 Biel / CH | [2013/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fäh, Mathias St. Nikolausstrasse 25 4500 Solothurn / CH | 02 /
Strazza, Mathias Eschenweg 7 2554 Meinisberg / CH | 03 /
Walther, Matthias Wasserhaus 39 4142 Münchenstein / CH | [2013/47] | Representative(s) | AMMANN PATENTANWÄLTE AG Schwarztorstrasse 31 Postfach 5135 3001 Bern / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2013/47] | AMMANN PATENTANWÄLTE AG BERN Schwarztorstrasse 31 Postfach 5135 3001 Bern / CH | Application number, filing date | 12168124.1 | 15.05.2012 | [2013/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2664297 | Date: | 20.11.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61C13/265 | [2013/47] | CPC: |
A61C13/2656 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verbindungssatz, Patrizenteil und Matrizenteil zur lösbaren Befestigung eines Zahnersatzes | [2013/47] | English: | Connection set, male component and female component for reversible fixing of a dental prosthetic | [2013/47] | French: | Ensemble de connexion, pièce de poinçon et pièce de matrice destinés à la fixation amovible d'une prothèse dentaire | [2013/47] | Examination procedure | 21.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/46] | 27.06.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/46] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2014 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9852487 (FRIATEC AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-6,9-13 * page 1, lines 18, 19; figures 5-17, 28, 30- * * page 7, line 17 - page 9, line 35 *; | [X]WO2008040134 (CENDRES & METAUX SA [CH], et al) [X] 1-6,9-13 * figure - *; | [X]WO9203987 (SULC JOSEF M [US]) [X] 1-6,9-13 * figure - *; | [X]DE3406448 (HADER HELMUT) [X] 1-17 * abstract *; | [X]EP0298286 (NOVA PRO ATTACHMENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-17 * abstract *; | [X]WO2005099613 (LAUX ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-6,9-13 * paragraph [0032]; figure - *; | [XD]WO2010025034 (ZEST ANCHORS INC [US], et al) [XD] 1,3-17 * paragraphs [0073] - [0076]; figures 3, 4, 13, 14, 16, 32, 42 *; | [E]EP2489326 (BONECARE BIOMECHANICS D O O [BA]) [E] 1-17 * paragraphs [0016] - [0022]; figure - * | by applicant | WO2010025034 | WO2010027229 | WO2008040134 |