EP2525478 - Automotive alternator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.09.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.10.2016 [2016/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Automotive Systems, Ltd. 2520, Takaba Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki 312-8503 / JP | [2012/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ishikawa, Toshio c/o Hitachi Automotive Systems, Ltd. 2520, Takaba Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki, 312-8503 / JP | 02 /
Izumi, Mitsuaki c/o Hitachi Automotive Systems, Ltd. 2520, Takaba Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki, 312-8503 / JP | 03 /
Ohsawa, Kunihiro c/o Hitachi Car Engineering Co.,Ltd. 2477, Takaba, Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki, 312-0062 / JP | [2012/47] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/47] | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12168337.9 | 16.05.2012 | [2012/47] | Priority number, date | JP20110110008 | 17.05.2011 Original published format: JP 2011110008 | [2012/47] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2525478 | Date: | 21.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2525478 | Date: | 23.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H02K11/04 | [2012/47] | CPC: |
H02K9/227 (EP,US);
H02K5/207 (EP,US);
H02K11/05 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Wechselstromgenerator | [2012/47] | English: | Automotive alternator | [2012/47] | French: | Alternateur de véhicule | [2012/47] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.2012 | Examination requested [2012/47] | 24.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/41] | 06.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2016 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4583005 (BEVANS LESLIE L [US]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]US5991184 (RUSSELL JOHN W [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH11164538 | JP2009060711 |