EP2665047 - System and method for intermediating games of chance to banking service providers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.10.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.11.2014 [2014/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OÜ PAD Turundus Kotka 26 11312 Tallinn / EE | [2013/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nuust, Jüri Paslepa küla, Noarootsi vald 91204 Lääne maakond / EE | 02 /
Seilenthal, Juhani Rehemäe talu, Karja küla, Leisi vald 94248 Saare Maakond / EE | 03 /
Lehtmets, Oliver Padriku tee 14/5-15 11912 Tallinn / EE | 04 /
Pärna, Hendrik Pärnu mnt 28-11 10141 Tallinn / EE | 05 /
Lepp, Aivar Lembitu 9 76901 Tabasalu / EE | 06 /
Raju, Kent Uus-Tatari 2a-10 10134 Tallinn / EE | [2013/47] | Representative(s) | Koppel, Mart Enn KOPPEL patendibüroo OÜ Oja tee 22-2, Tiskre, Harku vald 76916 Harjumaa / EE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/47] | Koppel, Mart Enn KOPPEL patendibüroo OÜ Roseni 10-151 10111 Tallinn / EE | Application number, filing date | 12168368.4 | 16.05.2012 | [2013/47] | Filing language | ET | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2665047 | Date: | 20.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G07F17/32 | [2013/47] | CPC: |
G07F17/3255 (EP);
G07F17/329 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur Vermittlung von Glücksspielen an Bankdienstleister | [2013/47] | English: | System and method for intermediating games of chance to banking service providers | [2013/47] | French: | Liant exempt de formaldéhyde et utilisation de produits d'isolation en laine minérale | [2013/47] | Examination procedure | 21.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/47] | 26.06.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/47] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2014 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [L] - EPO, "Mitteilung des Europäischen Patentamts vom 1. Oktober 2007 über Geschäftsmethoden = Notice from the European Patent Office dated 1 October 2007 concerning business methods = Communiqué de l'Office européen des brevets,en date du 1er octobre 2007, concernant les méthodes dans le domaine des activités", JOURNAL OFFICIEL DE L'OFFICE EUROPEEN DES BREVETS.OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT OFFICE.AMTSBLATTT DES EUROPAEISCHEN PATENTAMTS, OEB, MUNCHEN, DE, (20071101), vol. 30, no. 11, ISSN 0170-9291, pages 592 - 593, XP007905525 [L] 1,2 * the whole document * | by applicant | KR20020064851 | KR20010046278 | US5774884 | US7962362 | US7168616 | KR20000072505 |