EP2526869 - IMAGE PROCESSING DEVICE, RADIOGRAPHIC IMAGE CAPTURE SYSTEM, IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD AND IMAGE PROCESSING PROGRAM STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/48] | Image processing device, radiographic image capture system, image processing method and image processing program storage medium | ||
[2022/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.11.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.07.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.06.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.04.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | [2022/51] |
Former [2021/14] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | ||
Former [2012/48] | For all designated states Fujifilm Corporation 26-30 Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAJIMA, Takashi c/o FUJIFILM Corporation No. 798, Miyanodai, Kaisei-machi Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa / JP | [2012/48] | Representative(s) | Klunker IP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [2022/51] |
Former [2012/48] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12168381.7 | 16.05.2012 | [2012/48] | Priority number, date | JP20110114851 | 23.05.2011 Original published format: JP 2011114851 | [2012/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2526869 | Date: | 28.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2526869 | Date: | 07.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2526869 | Date: | 21.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61B6/02, A61B6/12, A61B90/11, A61B90/17, A61B10/02, A61B17/34, A61B6/00, // A61B17/00, A61B34/10 | [2022/18] | CPC: |
A61B6/502 (EP,US);
A61B10/0233 (EP,US);
A61B17/3403 (EP,US);
A61B6/025 (EP,US);
A61B6/12 (EP,US);
A61B6/461 (EP,US);
A61B6/469 (EP,US);
A61B90/11 (EP,US);
A61B90/17 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/48] | A61B6/02, A61B17/34, A61B19/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/08] |
Former [2012/48] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BILDVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, RÖNTGENBILDERFASSUNGSSYSTEM, BILDERFASSUNGSSYSTEM, BILDVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND BILDVERARBEITUNGSPROGRAMMSPEICHERUNGSMEDIUM | [2022/33] | English: | IMAGE PROCESSING DEVICE, RADIOGRAPHIC IMAGE CAPTURE SYSTEM, IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD AND IMAGE PROCESSING PROGRAM STORAGE MEDIUM | [2022/19] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGES, SYSTÈME D'ACQUISITION D'IMAGES RADIOGRAPHIQUES, SYSTÈME D'ACQUISITION D'IMAGES, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGES ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE DE PROGRAMME DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGES | [2022/33] |
Former [2012/48] | Bildverarbeitungsvorrichtung, Röntgenbilderfassungssystem, Bilderfassungssystem, Bildverarbeitungsverfahren und Bildverarbeitungsprogrammspeicherungsmedium | ||
Former [2012/48] | Image processing device, radiographic image capture system, image processing method and image processing program storage medium | ||
Former [2012/48] | Procédé pour produire un monoalkène par conversion enzymatique d'un monoester d'alkyle | Examination procedure | 07.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/08] | 30.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 18.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.11.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.11.2018 | Opposition(s) | 22.09.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 21.12.2022 | AT | 21.12.2022 | CZ | 21.12.2022 | DK | 21.12.2022 | EE | 21.12.2022 | ES | 21.12.2022 | FI | 21.12.2022 | HR | 21.12.2022 | IT | 21.12.2022 | LT | 21.12.2022 | LV | 21.12.2022 | MC | 21.12.2022 | NL | 21.12.2022 | PL | 21.12.2022 | RO | 21.12.2022 | RS | 21.12.2022 | SE | 21.12.2022 | SI | 21.12.2022 | SK | 21.12.2022 | SM | 21.12.2022 | NO | 21.03.2023 | GR | 22.03.2023 | IS | 21.04.2023 | PT | 21.04.2023 | GB | 16.05.2023 | IE | 16.05.2023 | LU | 16.05.2023 | BE | 31.05.2023 | CH | 31.05.2023 | FR | 31.05.2023 | LI | 31.05.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/24] | AL | 21.12.2022 | |
AT | 21.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2022 | ||
DK | 21.12.2022 | ||
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
MC | 21.12.2022 | ||
NL | 21.12.2022 | ||
PL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RO | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SI | 21.12.2022 | ||
SK | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
IS | 21.04.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
GB | 16.05.2023 | ||
IE | 16.05.2023 | ||
LU | 16.05.2023 | ||
BE | 31.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
FR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 21.12.2022 | |
AT | 21.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2022 | ||
DK | 21.12.2022 | ||
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
MC | 21.12.2022 | ||
NL | 21.12.2022 | ||
PL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RO | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SI | 21.12.2022 | ||
SK | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
IS | 21.04.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
IE | 16.05.2023 | ||
LU | 16.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AL | 21.12.2022 | |
AT | 21.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2022 | ||
DK | 21.12.2022 | ||
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
MC | 21.12.2022 | ||
NL | 21.12.2022 | ||
PL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RO | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SI | 21.12.2022 | ||
SK | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
IS | 21.04.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
LU | 16.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AL | 21.12.2022 | |
AT | 21.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2022 | ||
DK | 21.12.2022 | ||
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
MC | 21.12.2022 | ||
NL | 21.12.2022 | ||
PL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RO | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SK | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
IS | 21.04.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
LU | 16.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 21.12.2022 | |
AT | 21.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2022 | ||
DK | 21.12.2022 | ||
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
MC | 21.12.2022 | ||
NL | 21.12.2022 | ||
PL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RO | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SK | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
IS | 21.04.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
LU | 16.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AL | 21.12.2022 | |
AT | 21.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2022 | ||
DK | 21.12.2022 | ||
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
NL | 21.12.2022 | ||
PL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RO | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SK | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
IS | 21.04.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AL | 21.12.2022 | |
AT | 21.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2022 | ||
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
NL | 21.12.2022 | ||
PL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RO | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SK | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
IS | 21.04.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 21.12.2022 | |
AT | 21.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2022 | ||
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
NL | 21.12.2022 | ||
PL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RO | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SK | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 21.12.2022 | |
AT | 21.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2022 | ||
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
NL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RO | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 21.12.2022 | |
CZ | 21.12.2022 | ||
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
NL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RO | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | EE | 21.12.2022 | |
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
NL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 21.12.2022 | |
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
NL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | FI | 21.12.2022 | |
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
NL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/27] | FI | 21.12.2022 | |
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/24] | FI | 21.12.2022 | |
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | FI | 21.12.2022 | |
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | FI | 21.12.2022 | |
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 21.12.2022 | |
NO | 21.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6786870 (MIYAKI HIRONAKA [JP], et al) [Y] 1-14* the whole document *; | [Y]US2005033160 (YAMAGATA HITOSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0099] - [0118] *; | [Y]US2007019781 (HARAS GABRIEL [DE]) [Y] 1-14 * abstract *; | [Y]EP1844725 (BRAINLAB AG [DE]) [Y] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0016] - [0029] - [0 52] - [0054] *; | [Y]US2009274271 (PFISTER MARCUS [DE], et al) [Y] 1-14 * abstract *; | [Y]US2009326553 (MUSTUFA TABISH [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0010] , [0 73] - [0075] *; | [Y]US2010063496 (TROVATO KAREN I [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * abstract *; | [Y]US2010121316 (WEESE JUERGEN [NL], et al) [Y] 1-14 * the whole document * | by applicant | JP2004313478 | JP2005169070 | JP2007209651 | JP2010520006 |