EP2524730 - Apparatus for magnetic separation of particles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.2015 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lettergold Plastics Ltd Unit 4, Hammond Close Newmarket, Suffolk CB8 0AZ / GB | [2012/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Drummond, Andrew Robertson c/o Lettergold Plastics Ltd Unit 4 Hammond Close Newmarket, Suffolk CB8 0AZ / GB | [2012/47] | Representative(s) | Wightman, David Alexander Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham West Midlands B16 8QQ / GB | [2014/38] |
Former [2012/47] | Wightman, David Alexander Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 12168393.2 | 16.05.2012 | [2012/47] | Priority number, date | GB20110008156 | 16.05.2011 Original published format: GB 201108156 | [2012/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2524730 | Date: | 21.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2524730 | Date: | 27.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2524730 | Date: | 17.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B03C1/28, B03C1/30, B03C1/033 | [2012/47] | CPC: |
B03C1/286 (EP,GB);
B03C1/0332 (EP,GB);
B03C1/284 (EP,GB);
B03C1/30 (EP,GB);
C02F1/481 (EP);
C02F1/488 (GB);
F16L55/24 (EP);
F24D19/0092 (EP,GB);
B03C2201/18 (EP,GB);
C02F2303/14 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/47] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur magnetischen Trennung von Teilchen | [2012/47] | English: | Apparatus for magnetic separation of particles | [2012/47] | French: | Appareil pour la séparation magnétique des particules | [2012/47] | Examination procedure | 21.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.08.2013 | Examination requested [2013/40] | 20.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.08.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.06.2014 | Opposition(s) | 18.06.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.05.2012 | AL | 17.09.2014 | AT | 17.09.2014 | BE | 17.09.2014 | BG | 17.09.2014 | CY | 17.09.2014 | CZ | 17.09.2014 | DK | 17.09.2014 | EE | 17.09.2014 | ES | 17.09.2014 | FI | 17.09.2014 | HR | 17.09.2014 | IT | 17.09.2014 | LT | 17.09.2014 | LV | 17.09.2014 | MC | 17.09.2014 | MK | 17.09.2014 | MT | 17.09.2014 | NL | 17.09.2014 | RO | 17.09.2014 | RS | 17.09.2014 | SE | 17.09.2014 | SI | 17.09.2014 | SK | 17.09.2014 | SM | 17.09.2014 | TR | 17.09.2014 | NO | 17.12.2014 | GR | 18.12.2014 | IS | 17.01.2015 | PT | 19.01.2015 | LU | 16.05.2015 | CH | 31.05.2015 | LI | 31.05.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 16.05.2012 | |
AT | 17.09.2014 | ||
BE | 17.09.2014 | ||
BG | 17.09.2014 | ||
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
IT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
MC | 17.09.2014 | ||
MK | 17.09.2014 | ||
MT | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
RS | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SI | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
SM | 17.09.2014 | ||
TR | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
LU | 16.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
Former [2017/46] | HU | 16.05.2012 | |
AT | 17.09.2014 | ||
BE | 17.09.2014 | ||
BG | 17.09.2014 | ||
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
IT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
MC | 17.09.2014 | ||
MT | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
RS | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SI | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
SM | 17.09.2014 | ||
TR | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
LU | 16.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 16.05.2012 | |
AT | 17.09.2014 | ||
BG | 17.09.2014 | ||
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
IT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
MC | 17.09.2014 | ||
MT | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
RS | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SI | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
SM | 17.09.2014 | ||
TR | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
LU | 16.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 17.09.2014 | |
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
IT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
MC | 17.09.2014 | ||
MT | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
RS | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SI | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
LU | 16.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | AT | 17.09.2014 | |
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
IT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
MC | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
RS | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SI | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
LU | 16.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 17.09.2014 | |
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
IT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
RS | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SI | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 17.09.2014 | |
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
IT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
RS | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 17.09.2014 | |
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
RS | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 17.09.2014 | |
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
RS | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CY | 17.09.2014 | |
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
RS | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 17.09.2014 | |
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
RS | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/16] | CY | 17.09.2014 | |
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RS | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 17.09.2014 | |
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
RS | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 17.09.2014 | |
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | FI | 17.09.2014 | |
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 17.09.2014 | |
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 17.09.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]GB2402894 (ADEY CHRIS [GB]); | [A]GB2469145 (SINGH JOHAL PRAKASH [GB]) | by applicant | GB2402894 |