EP2562673 - Apparatus and method for securing mobile terminal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.05.2017 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pantech Co., Ltd. Pantech Building, 1-2, DMC Sangam-dong, Mapo-gu Seoul 121-792 / KR | [2013/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Joon-Seub Pantech Bldg., I-2, DMC, Sangam-dong, Mapo-gu 121-792 Seoul / KR | 02 /
Kim, Jin-Young Pantech Bldg., I-2, DMC, Sangam-dong, Mapo-gu 121-792 Seoul / KR | 03 /
Jeong, Min-Che Pantech Bldg., I-2, DMC, Sangam-dong, Mapo-gu 121-792 Seoul / KR | [2013/09] | Representative(s) | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [2016/28] |
Former [2013/09] | Jordan, Volker Otto Wilhelm Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12168788.3 | 22.05.2012 | [2013/09] | Priority number, date | KR20110084790 | 24.08.2011 Original published format: KR 20110084790 | [2013/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2562673 | Date: | 27.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2562673 | Date: | 13.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/52, G06F21/55 | [2016/08] | CPC: |
G06F21/52 (EP,US);
G06F21/10 (KR);
G06F21/45 (US);
G06F21/554 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/09] | G06F21/52 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/09] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Sicherung eines mobilen Endgerätes | [2013/09] | English: | Apparatus and method for securing mobile terminal | [2013/09] | French: | Appareil et procédé de sécurisation de terminal mobile | [2013/09] | Examination procedure | 22.05.2012 | Examination requested [2013/09] | 04.10.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 25.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 19.05.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.05.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.02.2016 | Opposition(s) | 18.04.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/25] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 25.10.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 25.10.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.11.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.05.2012 | AL | 13.07.2016 | AT | 13.07.2016 | BE | 13.07.2016 | CY | 13.07.2016 | CZ | 13.07.2016 | DK | 13.07.2016 | EE | 13.07.2016 | ES | 13.07.2016 | FI | 13.07.2016 | HR | 13.07.2016 | IT | 13.07.2016 | LT | 13.07.2016 | LV | 13.07.2016 | MC | 13.07.2016 | MK | 13.07.2016 | NL | 13.07.2016 | PL | 13.07.2016 | RO | 13.07.2016 | RS | 13.07.2016 | SE | 13.07.2016 | SI | 13.07.2016 | SK | 13.07.2016 | SM | 13.07.2016 | TR | 13.07.2016 | BG | 13.10.2016 | NO | 13.10.2016 | GR | 14.10.2016 | IS | 13.11.2016 | PT | 14.11.2016 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 22.05.2012 | |
AL | 13.07.2016 | ||
AT | 13.07.2016 | ||
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
CY | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
MK | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 22.05.2012 | |
AL | 13.07.2016 | ||
AT | 13.07.2016 | ||
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
CY | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 22.05.2012 | |
AL | 13.07.2016 | ||
AT | 13.07.2016 | ||
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 13.07.2016 | |
AT | 13.07.2016 | ||
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 13.07.2016 | |
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 13.07.2016 | |
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/31] | AT | 13.07.2016 | |
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
SM | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 13.07.2016 | |
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 13.07.2016 | |
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
ES | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
GR | 14.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 13.07.2016 | |
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
HR | 13.07.2016 | ||
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RS | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 13.07.2016 | |
IT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
NO | 13.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 13.07.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2010251340 (MARTIN BRIAN [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [X]EP2166478 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) [X] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]US7530106 (ZAITSEV OLEG V [RU], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]US7779472 (LOU VIC [TW]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document * |