EP2666902 - Laundry dryer and method of operating a laundry dryer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.10.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.12.2014 [2014/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Electrolux Home Products Corporation N.V. Raketstraat 40 1130 Brussels / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/48] | For all designated states Electrolux Home Products Corporation N.V. Raketstraat 40 1130 Brussel / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cavarretta, Francesco c/o Electrolux Italia S.p.A. Corso Lino Zanussi 30 33080 Porcia (PN) / IT | 02 /
Ugel, Maurizio c/o Electrolux Italia S.p.A. Corso Lino Zanussi 30 33080 Porcia (PN) / IT | [2013/48] | Representative(s) | Nardoni, Andrea, et al Electrolux Italia S.p.A. Corso Lino Zanussi, 30 33080 Porcia (PN) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2013/48] | Nardoni, Andrea, et al Electrolux Italia S.p.A. Corso Lino Zanussi, 30 33080 Porcia (PN) / IT | Application number, filing date | 12168912.9 | 22.05.2012 | [2013/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2666902 | Date: | 27.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | D06F58/24 | [2013/48] | CPC: |
D06F58/24 (EP,US);
D06F2103/04 (EP,US);
D06F2103/08 (EP,US);
D06F2103/32 (EP,US);
D06F2103/34 (EP,US);
D06F2103/58 (EP,US);
D06F2105/58 (EP,US);
D06F2105/62 (EP,US);
D06F58/38 (EP,US);
D06F58/50 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Wäschetrockner und Betriebsverfahren für einen Wäschetrockner | [2013/48] | English: | Laundry dryer and method of operating a laundry dryer | [2013/48] | French: | Séchoir à linge et procédé de fonctionnement dýun sèche-linge | [2013/48] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/49] | 10.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/49] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2014 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2307912 (LICENTIA GMBH) [A] 1-14 * column 2, line 46 - column 4, line 18; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [X]GB1390901 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [X] 15,16* page 3, line 85 - page 4, line 6; figure - *; | [A]DE8805385U (LICENTIA PATENT-VERWALTUNGS-GMBH) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0324653 (CREDA LTD [GB]) [X] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1199396 (WHIRLPOOL CO [US]) [X] 15,16 * paragraphs [0015] - [0016]; figure -; claim 1 * | by applicant | GB1390901 | DE3842778 | FR2696196 | EP1108811 |