EP2581163 - Method of cutting light emitting element packages employing ceramic substrate, and method of cutting multilayered object [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.04.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2013/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Eui-seok 608-103 SH Corp., Gaepo-dong, Gangnam-gu Seoul / KR | 02 /
Ji, Won-soo 406-101 Jugong Greenvill Apt. Maetan 3-dong Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Kim, Choo-ho 164-1501 Sanghyeon Maeul Hyundei Sungwoo Apt., Sanghyeon-dong, Suji-gu, Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Rhee, Shin-min 16-905 Seongsan Siyeong Apt., Seongsan 2-dong Mapo-gu Seoul / KR | 05 /
Lee, Dong-hun 112-1202 Daedong Apt., Buldang-dong, Seobuk-gu, Cheonan-si Chungcheongnam-do / KR | 06 /
Jun, Hee-young 101-305 Taean Prugio Apt., Gisan-dong Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2013/16] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/16] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12170049.6 | 30.05.2012 | [2013/16] | Priority number, date | KR20110104829 | 13.10.2011 Original published format: KR 20110104829 | [2013/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2581163 | Date: | 17.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/16] | Classification | IPC: | B23K26/40, B23K26/00 | [2013/16] | CPC: |
B23K26/40 (EP,US);
H01L33/48 (KR);
B23K26/0093 (EP,US);
H01L33/0095 (EP,US);
B23K2101/36 (EP,US);
B23K2103/172 (EP,US);
B23K2103/52 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12044 (EP,US);
H01L2933/0033 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12044, H01L2924/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Schneiden von lichtemittierenden Elementpaketen mit einem Keramiksubstrat, und Verfahren zum Schneiden von mehrschichtigen Objekten | [2013/16] | English: | Method of cutting light emitting element packages employing ceramic substrate, and method of cutting multilayered object | [2013/16] | French: | Procédé de découpe d'emballages d'élément électroluminescent utilisant un substrat en céramique et procédé de découpe d'un objet multicouche | [2013/16] | Examination procedure | 19.06.2012 | Examination requested [2013/16] | 01.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/22] | 25.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2015 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |